Steger v. Thomas
Petitioner: Kurtis Lee Steger
Respondent: Todd Thomas
Case Number: 1:2008cv00305
Filed: June 30, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY SECOND AMENDED PETITION 35 , 36 - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/30/09. (The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment against Steger and to close this case. Although Steger filed his "Notice of Appeal" to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals prematurely on March 23, 2009, that Notice of Appeal will be deemed to have been filed on the day judgment is entered in this case.) (emt, )
March 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY SECOND AMENDED PETITION 20 - Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 3/6/09. Objections to F&R due by 3/20/2009 (The court FINDS and RECOMMENDS that the Second Amended Petition be DENIED and dismissed with prejudice.) (emt, )
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISMISSING AMENDED PETITION 14 - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/15/08. (Failure to file an Amended Petition on or before November 5, 2008, that is in conformity with this order, shall result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Steger a new copy of the court's form for habeas petitions.) (emt, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steger v. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kurtis Lee Steger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?