International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 142 v. McCabe, Hamilton & Renny Co. Ltd.
Petitioner: International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 142
Respondent: McCabe, Hamilton & Renny Co. Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2008cv00458
Filed: October 14, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Presiding Judge: J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY MOVANT QUINTEN TAHARA'S MOTION TO INTERVENE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL THE ILWU-142 TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S JUDGMENT 65 , 67 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/13/09. (emt, )
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY MOTION TO INTERVENE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO COMPEL THE ILWU-142 TO ENFORCE THIS COURT'S JUDGMENT 35 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 6/30/09. ( Objections to F&R due by 7/15/2009) (emt, )
June 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY MOVANT QUINTEN TAHARA'S EX PARTE MOTION TO STAY ILWU-142 AND McCABE HAMILTON & RENNY'S RIGHT TO SETTLE ARBITRATION AWARD WITHOUT THE AGREEMENT OF QUENTIN TAHARA, MOVANT IN PENDING MOTION TO INTERVENE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO REQUIRE DEFENDANT JUDGMENT DEBTOR McCABE HAMILTON & RENNY'S POSTING OF BOND OR SURETY, FILED MAY 22, 2009 41 , 48 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 6/26/09. (emt, )
May 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO DENY MOVANT QUINTEN TAHARA'S EX PARTE MOTION TO STAY ILWU-142 AND MCCABE HAMILTON & RENNY'S RIGHT TO SETTLE ARBITRATION AWARD WITHOUT THE AGREEMENT OF QUINTEN TAHARA, MOVANT IN PENDING MOTION TO INTERVENE OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO REQUIRE DEFENDANT JUDGMENT DEBTOR MCCABE HAMILTON & RENNY'S POSTING OF BOND OR SURETY, FILED MAY 22, 2009 re 37 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 5/29/09. ( Objections to F&R due by 6/15/2009)(emt, )
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD 15 - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/14/09. (emt, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 142 v. McCabe, Hamilton & Renny Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: International Longshore and Warehouse Union, Local 142
Represented By: Herbert R. Takahashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: McCabe, Hamilton & Renny Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?