Fisher v. Cooper et al
Plaintiff: Barry A. Fisher
Defendant: Marvin R. Cooper and Kennedy Lili Cooper
Case Number: 1:2009cv00232
Filed: May 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Presiding Judge: J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION for 16 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/16/10. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 16 - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/15/10. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART 13 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANTS. ~ The Court RECOMMENDS that the district judge DIRECT the entry of a judgment that: (a) divests Defendant Kennedy Lili Cooper of title to the Condominium and vests title in Plaintiff;and (b) awards Plaintiff damages in the amount of $698,611.06, plus interest from December 30, 2008. The Court further RECOMMENDS that the district judge DENY Plaintiff's requ est for costs WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the refiling of a Bill of Costs after the entry of final judgment. ~ Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 12/30/2009. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. MODIFIED 12/30/2009 to note: A Copy of the Findings and Recommendation with the proposed order of adoption, has been served on December 30, 2009 upon the chambers of Judge J. Michael Seabright via the orders e-mail address: seabright_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry A. Fisher
Represented By: Kurt S. Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Lili Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?