Hawaii Motorsports Investment, Inc. et al v. Clayton Group Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hawaii Motorsports Investment, Inc. and Hawaii Motorsports Center Limited Partners
Defendant: Clayton Group Services, Inc. and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 1:2009cv00304
Filed: July 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 193 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 12/22/10. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 193 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES BE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART 181 - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 12/1/10. (The Court RECOMMENDS that Defendant be awarded $ 137,908.65 in attorneys' fees.) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION 187 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/22/10. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 187 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION THAT DEFENDANT'S BILL OF COSTS BE GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART 180 , 184 - Signed by Judge BARRY M. KURREN on 9/30/10. ("Specifically, the Court FINDS that Defendant is the prevailing part y and is therefore entitled to recover costs pursuant to Rule 54(d)(1). The Court RECOMMENDS that the district judge tax $22,489.76 in costs against Plaintiffs and in favor of Defendant.") (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry .
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS (NOS. 115 , 117 , 119 ) FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT 143 , 144 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/27/10. ("This court grants BV summary judgment on all claims. The Clerk of Court is ordered to enter judgment for Defendant and to close this case.") (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON SECOND CAUSE OF ACTION 95 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 6/29/10. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electro nic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS 41 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/5/10. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 4 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 9/25/09. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive elect ronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawaii Motorsports Investment, Inc. et al v. Clayton Group Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Motorsports Investment, Inc.
Represented By: Sandra D. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Motorsports Center Limited Partners
Represented By: Sandra D. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Group Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Badger, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?