Skaaning v. Sorensen et al
Plaintiff: Peter Skaaning
Defendant: Thomas Sorensen, SORENSEN FAMILY LIVING TRUST, Inspiration Hawaii, Inc., Inspiration International, LLC, TPS, LLC, HDC Properties, LLC and KTS Properties, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2009cv00364
Filed: August 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: DAVID ALAN EZRA
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER: (1) MODIFYING 71 THE REPORT OF THE SPECIAL MASTER RECOMMENDING THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES BE DENIED; (2) DISMISSING 77 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ADOPT REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; (3) DISM ISSING 67 , 69 DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION; AND (4) DISMISSING 76 , 78 DEFENDANTS' OBJECTIONS TO THE REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 1/19/ 2010. ~ The Report of Special Master is MODIFIED to dismiss Defendants' motions for attorneys' fees based on lack of jurisdiction rather than on a ruling on the merits ~ (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 REPORT OF SPECIAL MASTER RECOMMENDING THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES (DOC NOS. 67 AND 69 ) BE DENIED. Signed by JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 12/10/2009. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipant s registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications WILL BE SERVED by first class mail on DECEMBER 11, 2009. F&R and Proposed Order to Chambers of Judge David Alan Ezra via orders e-mail address: ezra_orders@hid.uscourts.gov.
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER (1) GRANTING 18 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, AND (2) DENYING AS MOOT 31 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 11/10/2009. [Order follows hearing on Motions 18 and 31 held 11/09/2009; Minutes-docket entry no. 63 ] Other motion terminated: 56 : Appeal of Magistrate Decision to District Court (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skaaning v. Sorensen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Skaaning
Represented By: Mahilani E.K. Hiatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Sorensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SORENSEN FAMILY LIVING TRUST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspiration Hawaii, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inspiration International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TPS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HDC Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KTS Properties, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?