Kahue v. Pacific Environmental Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Cedric K. Kahue
Defendant: Pacific Environmental Corporation, John Does 1-20, Mary Does 1-20, Doe Corporations 1-20, Doe Partnerships 1-20, Doe Associates 1-20, Doe Governmental Agencies 1-20, Other Entities 1-20, M/V Penco 1, M/V Penco 2 and Doe Vessels 1-20
Case Number: 1:2010cv00001
Filed: January 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688 Jones Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER GRANTING INTERVENOR'S REQUEST TO POSTPONE PARTICIPATION AT TRIAL UNTIL AN AWARD HAS BEEN MADE AND THE EXTENT OF INTERVENOR'S LIEN MAY BE DETERMINED: "IT IS ORDERED that: 1. The intervenor may be excused from participation at t rial, although it will be bound by the Court's rulings on matters that arise prior to an award, and during any part of the trial from which the intervenor has requested the Court excuse its presence. 2. The intervenor's agreement to be bou nd without objection to the Court's rulings does not apply if the intervenor is called upon to produce a witness to testify during the liability phase of trial (which the intervenor has agreed to do if the plaintiff and defendants are unable to stipulate to the amount of the lien), at which point the intervenor may fully represent its witness during the witness's testimony. 3. The intervenor's agreement to be bound also does not apply to limit or enlarge any rights that arise afte r an award has been made." Signed by District JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on March 29, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' 219 MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION/CLARIFICATION. Signed by District JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on January 30, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electro nic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER (1) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 105 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; AND (2) DENYING DEFENDANTS' 109 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION: "On the basis of the foregoing, PENCO's M otion for Summary Judgment, filed on July 19, 2011 is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's Count II claim for unseaworthiness and DENIED in all other respects. PENCO's Motion for Summary Judgmen t on Complaint in Intervention, filed on August 3, 2011, is HEREBY DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED." Signed by District JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on November 29, 2011. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants regi stered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kahue v. Pacific Environmental Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cedric K. Kahue
Represented By: Jay L Friedheim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Environmental Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Associates 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Penco 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Penco 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Vessels 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?