Marisco, Ltd. v. Sailele, The Tug Boat et al
Plaintiff: |
Marisco, Ltd. |
Defendant: |
Sailele, The Tug Boat and American Samoa Government |
Case Number: |
1:2010cv00137 |
Filed: |
March 11, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
Presiding Judge: |
UNASSIGNED |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E KOBAYASHI |
Nature of Suit: |
Marine |
Cause of Action: |
Breach of Contract - Maritime Rule 9(h) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 3, 2012 |
Filing
194
AMENDED ORDER GRANTING BANK OF HAWAII'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF 162 AND GRANTING MARISCO, LIMITED'S SUBSTANTIVE JOINDER 169 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/3/2012. ~ Order amends order filed 11/2 8/2012, docket entry no. 192 ~ (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
November 28, 2012 |
Filing
192
ORDER GRANTING BANK OF HAWAII'S MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF 162 AND GRANTING MARISCO, LIMITED'S SUBSTANTIVE JOINDER 169 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/28/2012. ~ Excerpt of Conclusion: "[T]his Court HEREBY GRANTS an injunction in favor of Marisco and BOH [Bank of Hawaii]...." "The injunction shall remain in effect until dissolved by this Court." ~ [Order follows hearing held 10/26/2012. Minutes: doc no. 174 ] (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
October 5, 2012 |
Filing
158
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART GARNISHEE BANK OF HAWAII'S MOTION FOR INTERPLEADER re: 142 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/5/2012. Excerpt of Conclusion: ~ "The Motion is gr anted as to [Bank of Hawaii's ("BOH")] request to interplead the amount of $824,071.15 to the district court in a non-interest bearing account. The Court ORDERS BOH to deposit the interpleader funds with the district court by O ctober 22, 2012. If BOH files a written request to deposit the interpleader funds in an interest bearing account, BOH must do so before depositing the funds with the district court. The Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to BOH's request for an injunction against further proceedings regarding the interpleader funds. Further, Marisco's request to increase the amount of the interpleader to include interest and attorneys' fees and costs is HEREBY DENIED." (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications will be served by first class mail on Tuesday, October 9, 2012.
|
August 23, 2012 |
Filing
139
ORDER GRANTING MARISCO LTD.'S EX PARTE REQUEST FOR ORDER DIRECTING DISBURSEMENT OF FUNDS FROM GARNISHEE BANK OF HAWAI'I 117 AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART BANK OF HAWAII'S MOTION FOR INSTRUCTIONS 131 . Signed by JUDGE LESL IE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/23/2012. [Order follows hearing held 8/16/2012 on Motion for Instructions. Minutes: 138 ] (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications will be served by first class mail on August 24, 2012.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?