RM Yogurt Hawaii LLC v. Red Mango Franchise Company et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: RM Yogurt Hawaii LLC
Defendant: Red Mango Franchise Company, Daniel Kim and Doe Defendants 1-20
Case Number: 1:2010cv00157
Filed: March 18, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2010 Filing 22 EP: Discussion held. 5 DEFENDANTS RED MANGO FRANCHISE COMPANY AND DANIEL KIM'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR IMPROPER VENUE UNDER FEDERAL RULE 12(b)(3) is GRANTED. Counsel for plaintiff will talk to his client and will get back to the Court by June 22, 2010 regarding the issue of transferring the case to the Northern District of Texas. Court shall prepare a written order. (Court Reporter Katherine Eismann) (SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(mrf)No COS issued for this docket entry
June 16, 2010 Filing 21 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 6/16/2010. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 6/21/2011 before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2011 09:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/9/2011 08:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Settlement Conference set for 2/25/2011 10:00 AM before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Motions due by 1/19/2011. Discovery due by 4/22/2011. ( C5 - no record, 9:00-9:05am.) (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )No COS issued for this docket entry
June 14, 2010 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. Hearing on 5 Defendants Red Mango Franchise Company and Daniel Kim's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Federal Rule 12(b)(3) is set for 6/18/2010 at 10:00 AM in Aha Nonoi before SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
June 13, 2010 Filing 19 EO: Hearing on 5 Defendants Red Mango Franchise Company and Daniel Kim's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Federal Rule 12(b)(3) currently set for June 14, 2010 at 9:00 a.m. is VACATED. The Court shall set a new motion hearing date. (SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 9, 2010 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff RM Yogurt Hawaii LLC's. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bush, Thomas)
June 9, 2010 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendants Red Mango Franchising Company and Daniel Kim. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Chong Kee, Dennis)
May 27, 2010 Filing 16 REPORT of Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bush, Thomas)
May 7, 2010 Filing 15 Plaintiff's STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS 5 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Federal Rule 12(b)(3) filed March 29, 2010 and ORDER. ( Motion Hearing set for 6/14/2010 09:00 AM before Senior JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR.) Signed by Senior JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on May 7, 2010. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 6, 2010 Filing 14 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set 6/14/10 shall be continued to 09:00AM on 6/16/2010 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(sna, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 30, 2010 Filing 13 REPLY re 12 Memorandum in Opposition to 5 Motion,, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Federal Rule 12(b)(3) filed by Daniel Kim, Red Mango Franchise Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Word Count, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Chong Kee, Dennis) Modified on 5/3/2010 - inserting link to motion (bbb, ).
April 23, 2010 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Federal Rule 12(b)(3); Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Daniel Kim; Exhibits "A" - "C"; Certificate of Service MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Federal Rule 12(b)(3); Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Daniel Kim; Exhibits "A" - "C"; Certificate of Service filed by RM Yogurt Hawaii LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Alex B. Choi, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Bush, Thomas)
April 15, 2010 Filing 11 EO: Hearing on 5 Defendants Red Mango Franchise Company and Daniel Kim's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Federal Rule 12(b)(3) is CONTINUED from 5/10/2010 to 5/12/2010 at 10:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Opposition briefs are due on or before 4/23/2010. Reply briefs are due on or before 4/30/2010. (SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 15, 2010 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. 5 Defendants Red Mango Franchise Company and Daniel Kim's Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Federal Rule 12(b)(3) is set for 5/10/2010 at 10:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
April 1, 2010 Filing 9 Defendants' APPLICATION TO PERMIT GRANT A. WALSH AND CHERYL L. MULLIN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE;# 1 Declaration of Grant A. Walsh, # 2 Declaration of Cheryl L. Mullin, # 3 Consent of Dennis W. Chong Kee, # 4 ORDER Granting Ex Parte Application, # 5 Certificate of Service. 7 Filing Fee as to Walsh Received, 8 Filing Fee Received as to Mullin. [Attorneys Grant A. Walsh & Cheryl L. Mullin for Daniel Kim & Red Mango Franchise Company added]. Signed by Magistrate JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on March 31, 2010. (bbb, ) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on 04/02/2010
March 30, 2010 Filing 8 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Atty Cheryl L. Mullin: $ 225.00,receipt number 251009 re 6 Submission of Proposed Order, (bbb, )
March 30, 2010 Filing 7 Pro Hac Vice Filing fee for Atty Grant A. Walsh: $ 225.00,receipt number 251008 re 6 Submission of Proposed Order, (bbb, )
March 29, 2010 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue Under Federal Rule 12(b)(3); Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Daniel Kim; Exhibits "A" - "C"; Certificate of Service Dennis W. Chong Kee appearing for Defendants Daniel Kim, Red Mango Franchise Company (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration of Daniel Kim, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Certificate of Service)(Chong Kee, Dennis)
March 22, 2010 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Daniel Kim, Red Mango Franchise Company. (Chipchase, Calvert)
March 18, 2010 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number 250902 re 1 Notice of Removal. (afc)
March 18, 2010 Filing 2 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 6/14/2010 before JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 3/18/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Memo)(afc) No COS issued for this docket entry
March 18, 2010 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by defendant Red Mango Franchise Company, defendant Daniel Kim. Removal from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, Civil case number 10-1-0337-02-PWB. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(afc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/22/2010: # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (bbb, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RM Yogurt Hawaii LLC v. Red Mango Franchise Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RM Yogurt Hawaii LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Bush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Mango Franchise Company
Represented By: Calvert G. Chipchase, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Kim
Represented By: Calvert G. Chipchase, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?