Brewer Environmental Industries, LLC et al v. Matson Terminals, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brewer Environmental Industries, LLC, BEI Holdings, Inc., Brewer Environmental Industries Holdings, Inc. and Seabright Insurance Company
Defendant: Matson Terminals, Inc., Matson Navigation Company, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2010cv00221
Filed: April 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: Longshoremen's and Harbor Workers' Compensation Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING 75 SEABRIGHT INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF DEFENDANTS' LIABILITY: "On the basis of the foregoing, SeaBright's Motion for Summary Judgment or , in the Alternative, Partial Summary Judgment of Defendants' Liability, filed February 8, 2012, is HEREBY GRANTED. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to enter judgment in favor of SeaBright and against Matson. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on May 31, 2012. (bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 55 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: On the basis of the foregoing, Defendants Matson Terminals, Inc. and Matson Navigation Company, Inc.'s Motion for J udgment on the Pleadings or for Summary Judgment, filed on June 17, 2011, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion is DENIED as to Plaintiff's First Cause of Action (Equitable Subrogation) and GRANTED as to Plaintiff's Secon d Cause of Action (Equitable Indemnity). The case is currently set for trial on February 28, 2011, and the parties informed the Court at the hearing that there has been no discovery pending the Court's ruling on the Motion. The parties are to co ntact Magistrate Judge Chang's chambers within fourteen days of the date of this order to schedule a trial re-setting conference. IT IS SO ORDERED." Signed by District JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on October 31, 2011. (bbb, )< hr>CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' 30 MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS OR FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: "On the basis of the foregoing, Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or for Summary Judgment, file d on January 24, 2011, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED insofar as the Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE Plaintiffs' breach of contract claim and equitable indemnity claim as to Plaintiff Brewer, and Plaintiffs� 39; breach of contract claim as to Seabright. The Motion is DENIED insofar as Plaintiff Seabright seeks unreimbursed compensation and medical benefits, plus interest owed, as well as attorneys' fees and legal costs incurred in defending Brewer, plus interest owed, through its equitable indemnity claim. The Court GRANTS Seabright leave to amend its Complaint as specifically permitted by this Order. IT IS SO ORDERED.". Signed by District JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on April 28, 2011. ( bbb, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer Environmental Industries, LLC et al v. Matson Terminals, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brewer Environmental Industries, LLC
Represented By: Richard C. Wootton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEI Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Richard C. Wootton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brewer Environmental Industries Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Richard C. Wootton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seabright Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard C. Wootton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matson Terminals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matson Navigation Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?