Lee v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Juanita Faye Pualani Lee
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Countrywide Bank FSB and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2010cv00687
Filed: November 19, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Presiding Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DOC. NO. 124 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/30/2014. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticip ants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER (1) GRANTING DEFENDANT MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DOC. NO. 70; (2) GRANTING DEFENDANT COUNTRYWIDE BANK, FSB'S MOTION TO DISMISS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, DOC. NO. 69; AND (3) GRANTING LIMITED LEAVE TO AMEND re 69 ; 70 - Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/26/12. " This Order limits Plaintiff to filing a Third Amended Complaint that attempts to cure the specific deficiencies identifie d in this Order. That is, this Order does not grant Plaintiff leave to amend to file a Third Amended Complaint that asserts any different theories or causes of action. If Plaintiff fails to file a Third Amended Complaint by January 11, 2013, this action will be dismissed and the case closed." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER (1) Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss, Doc. No. 57 ; And (2) Granting Defendant Countrywide Bank, FSB's Motion To Dismiss, Doc. No. 56 . Signed by JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/27/12. (gls, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Faye Pualani Lee
Represented By: Frederick J. Arensmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Lane C. Hornfeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?