Del Piano et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Linda Wunder Del Piano and Douglas B. Hackett
Defendant: ONEWEST Bank, FSB, Express Capital Lending, HSBC Bank USA, N.A., First American Title Insurance Co., Suchan Murray, Routh Crabtree Olsen, P.S., Peter T. Stone, Does 1 to 10, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Indymac Financial Services
Case Number: 1:2011cv00140
Filed: March 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Hawaii
Presiding Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER DENYING (1) "PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY EX PARTE MOTION TO REJECT DEFENDANTS' 'FINDINGS OF FACTS; AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; AND ORDER GRANTING' BECAUSE OF MATERIALLY SIGNIFICANT FALSE STATEMENTS OF FACT; MOTION TO VACATE OR RE VERSE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS AN 'INTERLOCUTORY OF FORECLOSURE'" AND (2) "EX PARTE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME FOR HEARING" re 106 ; 107 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/4/12. (emt, )CER TIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Linda Wunder Del Piano, Douglas B. Hackett, Bradley R. Pulice, Esq., Franklin D. Pacarro, Jr., Esq. and Robert D. S. Kim, Esq. shall be served by first class mail at the addresses of record on April 5, 2012.
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FINDINGS OF FACT; CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; AND ORDER GRANTING: (1) 77 DEFENDANTS MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.'S, ONEWEST BANK, FSB'S, HSBC BANK USA, N.A., A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR BCAP 2008-IN1'S, SUCHAN MU RRAY'S, AND INDYMAC FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.'S (INCORRECTLY NAMED IN THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AS INDYMAC FINANCIAL SERVICES) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (RE: AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VERIFICATION OF DEBT ELSE RELEASE OF CLAIM AND FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, FILED MAY 20, 2011) ; (2) 83 DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE CO.'S JOINDER IN 77 DEFENDANTS' MOITON FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE: AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VERIFICATION OF DEBT ELSE RELEASE OF CLAIM AND FOR DECLAR ATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; AND (3) 75 DEFENDANT HSBC BANK USA, N.A., A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR BCAP 2008-IN1'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (RE: HSBC BANK USA, N.A.'S COUNTERCLAIM FOR FORECLOSURE), AND FOR INTERLOCUTORY DECR EE OF FORECLOSURE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/3/12. -- " Summary Judgment and Interlocutory Decree of Foreclosure in favor HSBC and against Plaintiffs is hereby entered. Pursuant to Rule 54(b), Federal Rules of C ivil Procedure, this Court expressly directs that said summary judgment and interlocutory decree of foreclosure be and are hereby entered as final judgments as to HSBC's Counterclaim for Foreclosure as there is no just reason for delay." Ro bert D. S. Kim is appointed as Commissioner by this Court. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address l isted on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Linda Wunder Del Piano, Douglas B. Hackett, Bradley R. Pulice, Esq., Franklin D. Pacarro, Jr., Esq. and Robert D. S. Kim, Esq. served by first class mail at the addresses of record on April 3, 2012.
February 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING (1) DEFENDANTS MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC.'S,ONEWEST BANK, FSB'S, HSBC BANK USA, N.A., A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR BCAP 2008-IN1'S, SUCHAN MURRAY'S, AND INDYMAC FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. 'S(INCORRECTLY NAMED IN THE AMENDED COMPLAINT AS INDYMAC FINANCIAL SERVICES) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (RE: AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VERIFICATION OF DEBT ELSE RELEASE OF CLAIM AND FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, FILED MAY 20, 2011); (2) DE FENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE INSURANCE CO.'S JOINDER; AND (3) HSBC BANK USA, N.A., A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, AS TRUSTEE FOR BCAP 2008-IN1'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (RE: HSBC'S BANK USA, N.A.S COUNTERCLAIM FOR FORECLOSURE), AND FOR IN TERLOCUTORY DECREE OF FORECLOSURE 75 ; 77 ; 83 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/24/12. (" For the foregoing reasons, the MERS Motion is GRANTED as to all counts. Because all arguments made by MERS Defendants ar e applicable to all Defendants, the court grants summary judgment as to all Defendants. Summary judgment is also GRANTED as to the HSBC Motion. HSBC is directed to submit a proposed order and foreclosure decree to all parties and the court within 14 days of the date of this order.") (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Linda Wunder Del Piano, Douglas B. Hackett, Bradley R. Pulice, Esq. and Franklin D. Pacarro, Esq. served by first class mail at the addresses of record on February 24, 2012.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Piano et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONEWEST Bank, FSB
Represented By: David B. Rosen
Represented By: Lauren M Akitake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Capital Lending
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Lauren M Akitake
Represented By: David B. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Co.
Represented By: David J. Minkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suchan Murray
Represented By: Lauren M Akitake
Represented By: David B. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Routh Crabtree Olsen, P.S.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter T. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: David B. Rosen
Represented By: Lauren M Akitake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Financial Services
Represented By: David B. Rosen
Represented By: Lauren M Akitake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Wunder Del Piano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas B. Hackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?