March v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Debra L. March
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Chase Home Finance
Case Number: 1:2012cv00306
Filed: May 29, 2012
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Kauai
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2014 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S 89 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/26/2014. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received t his document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants (Debra L. March) not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 6, 2015 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 142 MAGISTRATE JUDGES MARCH 31, 2015 FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION THAT DEFENDANT U.S. BANK'S MOTION FOR CONFIRMATION OF SALE, FOR APPROVAL OF COMMISSIONERS REPORT, AND FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION BE GRANTED. Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/6/2015. ~ the Court OVERRULES Marchs objections, andADOPTS the March 31, 2015 Findings of Fact and Recommendation that U.S.Banks Motion for Confirmation of Sale, for Approval of Commissioners Report,and for Writ of Possession be granted, as the opinion and order of this Court. TheMotion for Confirmation of Sale, for Approval of Commissioners Report, and forWrit of Possession (Dkt. No. 133 ) is GRANTED as stated in the March 31, 2015Findings of Fact and Re commendation. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 27, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS THE CLAIM OF THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT STATE OF HAWAI'I 71 . Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 03/27/2014. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to r eceive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: March v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra L. March
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Home Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.