United States of America v. Staton et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ronald B. Staton, Brenda L. Staton, Navy Federal Credit Union, Capstead Mortgage Corporation and Hawaii, State of
Case Number: 1:2012cv00319
Filed: June 4, 2012
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: BARRY M. KURREN
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2018 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS RONALD AND BRENDA STATONS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re 328 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ronald B. Staton, Brenda L. Staton. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 04/19/2018. (eps, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants served by First Class Mail on 04/20/2018 to: Ronald B. Staton; Brenda L. Staton; 233 Kalalau St.; Honolulu, HI 96825 to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 10, 2018 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONFIRMING SALE, APPROVING COMMISSIONER'S REPORT, AND DETERMINING PRIORITY OF FUTURE DISBURSEMENTS. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 04/10/2018. (eps, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to: RONALD B. STATON; BRENDA L. STATON; 233 KALALAU ST.; HONOLULU, HI 96825 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
April 3, 2018 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT BRENDA L. STATON'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AN INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL re 297 .. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 04/03/2018. (eps, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Part icipants served by First Class Mail on April 4, 2018 to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF): Ronald B. Staton, 233 Kalalau St. Honolulu, HI 96825 ; Brenda L. Staton, 233 Kalalau St., Honolulu, HI 96825
February 16, 2018 276 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FINDING DEFENDANT BRENDA STATON'S CLAIM THAT THE FORECLOSURE SALE FAILS TO PROTECT HER INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY TO BE WITHOUT MERIT re 255 Notice of Lis Pendens filed by Brenda L. Staton. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 02/16/201 8. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on February 20, 2018 : Ronald B. Staton; Brenda Staton; 233 Kalalau St.; Honolulu, HI 96825
August 31, 2015 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THE THIRD CLAIM IN THE COMPLAINT re 109 , 124 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 8/31/2015. "The Court further ORDERS that Ronald Staton's federal tax liens and Ronald and Brenda Staton's mortgage be foreclosed on the Residence, and ORDERS the sale of the Residence free and clear of all liens, including Capstead's senior mortgage. A separate Order of Foreclosure and Judicial Sale will follow this Order." "In addition, the Court DISMISSES with prejudice Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. 1 , pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2) and Plaintiff's request." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Ronald B. Staton and Brenda Staton served by first class mail at the address of record on August 31, 2015.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Staton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Charles M. Duffy
Represented By: Derrick K. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald B. Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda L. Staton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navy Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstead Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?