Wilcox v. Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Wilcox
Defendant: Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC and Does 1-15
Case Number: 1:2013cv00508
Filed: October 7, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED CY PRES REMEDY AND DIRECTING REVERSION OF UNCLAIMED FUNDS TO DEFENDANT re 572 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 2/6/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEPa rticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING DEFENDANT'S OFFER OF COMPROMISE, PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO APPROVE AND ENTER JUDGMENT, PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS, AND PRELIMINARI LY APPROVING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR INCENTIVE AWARD FOR CLASS REPRESENTATIVE re 539 , 547 , 556 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 12/14/2016. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER FINDING PLAINTIFFS ARE ENTITLED TO A JURY TRIAL - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 9/16/2016. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 471 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS TO PRESENT A TRIAL PLAN re 444 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 8/15/2016. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive e lectronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING RESOLUTION OF DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS, RULE 23(F) PETITION, AND ANY RESULTING APPEAL AND VACATING TRIAL DATE re 402 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 3/7/2016. &qu ot;For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Lloyds' Motion to Stay, and this case is STAYED as to all matters until the Ninth Circuit rules on Lloyds' Rule 23(f) Petition. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the currently sch eduled trial date. In the event the Ninth Circuit denies the Petition, the Court will issue an order setting forth dates for the trial and final pretrial conference, and other deadlines. Should the Ninth Circuit grant the Petition, the case will b e stayed until further ruling by the Ninth Circuit regarding the merits of the composition of the class." "In light of this Order, Plaintiffs' Fourth Ex Parte Motion to Modify the Court's Rule 16 Scheduling Order before Magistrate Judge Puglisi should be stayed until the Ninth Circuit rules on Lloyds' Rule 23(f) Petition and, depending on the Ninth Circuit's ruling, this Court either sets a new trial date (and final pretrial conference date and ot her deadlines) or stays the case pending the Ninth Circuit's further consideration of the merits of Lloyds' Petition regarding the appropriate constitution of the class." re 422 , 178 Motion terminated: 402 MOTION to Stay [Lloyds TSB Bank PLC's Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Dispositive Motions, Rule 23(F) Petition, and Any Resulting Appeal] filed by Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC. Case stayed. (emt, )< FONT SIZE=1>CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON THEIR AND THE PUTATIVE CLASS'S CLAIM FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT ON COUNT I, DENYING PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR DECLATORY RELIEF, GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT& #039;S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, AND SUA SPONTE GRANTING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO PLAINTIFFS ON COUNT II re 249 , 251 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 2/11/2016. "For the foregoing reasons, the Court: (1) DEN IES Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Their and the Putative Class's Claim for Breach of Contract on Count I; (2) GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Lloyds' Motion for Summary Judgment; (3) sua sponte GRANTS partial summary judgment to Plaintiffs on Count II, and (4) DENIES Plaintiffs' request for declaratory relief. Regarding its second and third holdings, the Court finds that the Cost of Funds provision in the facility agreements does n ot prescribe a specific methodology for calculating the Cost of Funds component of the IMS loans' interest rate; does not specifically require the Cost of Funds component to track 3-month LIBOR; and does not specifically require Lloyds to fund Plaintiffs' loans with short-term money. However, the agreements do allow Lloyds to pass on liquidity costs and liquidity requirements to borrowers. Additionally, the Cost of Funds provision does not specifically restrict Lloyds from altering i ts cost calculation. However, the Court also finds an implied term in the agreements which limits Lloyds' discretion to alter interest rates. That implied term requires Lloyds, when altering interest rates, to do so in a manner that comports wit h purely commercial considerations, including whether it is in financial difficulty because it is obliged to pay higher rates on interest to the money market; however, Lloyds must refrain from acting dishonestly, for an improper purpose, capriciously , or arbitrarily, or in a manner so unreasonable that no reasonable lender would do the same (the Nash standard). The Court otherwise DENIES both parties' motions for summary judgment, as issues of material fact regarding Lloyds 9; alleged breach of the express and implied terms of the facility agreements remain." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART, REJECTING IN PART, AND MODIFYING IN PART THE FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS TO GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION re 317 , 332 - Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 1/8/2016. < font size=2> "For the foregoing reasons, the Court ADOPTS in part, REJECTS in part, and MODIFIES in part the F&R. The Court REJECTS the F&R's finding that Plaintiffs have demonstrated the superiority of class litigation under Rul e 23(b)(3) as to the class defined therein. However, the Court will certify the class as defined therein with the modification that the class shall be limited to plaintiffs of U.S. and Canadian citizenship. The remainder of the F&R is AD OPTED, over Lloyd's objections." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS re: 62 . Signed by JUDGE ALAN C KAY on 12/23/2014. Written Order follows hearing held 12/15/2014 on Defendant Lloyds Bank PLC's Motion to Dism iss the Claims Asserted in the Second Amended Complaint (motion, doc 62 ). Minutes of hearing: doc. no. 71 . (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcox v. Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Wilcox
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Laurence F. Janssen
Represented By: Glenn T. Melchinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyds TSB Bank, PLC
Represented By: Christian K. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?