In re: Angel L. Alvarado
Petitioner: Angel L. Alvarado
Case Number: 1:2014cv00394
Filed: September 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISMISSAL ORDER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2), 1915(A)(b)(1) re 9 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 11/7/2014. "(1) The second amended Complaint and this action are DISMISSED as frivolous and for failure to state a claim. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(b) & 1915A(b)(1). This dismissal is with prejudice and without further leave to amend." (2) The Clerk is DIRECTED to note on the docket that this action was termin ated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(b) & 1915A(b)(1), and to enter judgment." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Angel L. Alvarado served by first class mail at the address of record on November 7, 2014.
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS REQUEST 7 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/16/2014. (afc) Excerpt of Conclusion: "The amended Complaint is DISMISSED as frivolous and for f ailure to state a claim." "Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies noted above on or before October 31, 2014. Failure to timely amend the Complaint and cure its pleading deficiencies will resul t in dismissal of this action for failure to state a claim."CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). A copy of the instant Order and a copy of those forms delineated in the order, will be served on October 17, 2014 by first class mail addressed to Angel L. Alvarado.
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re 1 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 9/29/2014. "(1) The Complaint is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(b) & 1915A(b)(1). (2) Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies noted above on or before October 29, 2014. Failure to timely amend the Complaint and cure its pleading deficiencies will result in dismissal of this action f or failure to state a claim. (3) The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff court forms for a prisoner civil rights complaint and habeas petition so that he can comply with the directions in this Order." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Angel L. Alvarado served by first class mail a t the address of record on September 29, 2014. The Clerks Office included the following court forms: 1) Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus and instructions; 2) Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus and instructions; 3) Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint and instructions; 4) Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner and instructions.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Angel L. Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angel L. Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?