Saofaigaalii v. Tripler Army Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Toatuga M. Saofaigaalii
Defendant: Tripler Army Medical Center and Department of the Army
Case Number: 1:2014cv00455
Filed: October 9, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN S.C. CHANG
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 42 - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 6/23/2016. Motion terminated: 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tripler Army Medical Center, Depar tment of the Army. Status Conference set for 7/18/2016 09:00 AM before JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Toatuga M. Saofaigaalii served by first class mail at the address of record on June 23, 2016.
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS re 25 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 8/25/2015. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Toatuga M. Saofaigaalii served by first class mail at the address of record on August 25, 2015.
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re 3 , 4 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/22/2014. &q uot;Saofaigaalii's IFP Application and Request for Counsel are denied. Given the denial of this IFP Application, Saofaigaalii must either pay the filing fee no later than November 17, 2014, or submit a new IFP Application establishing his paup er status. Failure to do either by that date will result in the automatic dismissal of this action." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received thi s document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Toatuga M. Saofaigaalii shall be served by first class mail at the address of record on October 23, 2014. A copy of the court's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs shall be included in the mailing.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saofaigaalii v. Tripler Army Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toatuga M. Saofaigaalii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tripler Army Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Army
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?