American Automobile Insurance Company, et al v. Hawaii Nut & Bolt, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
American Automobile Insurance Company and National Surety Corporation |
Defendant: |
Hawaii Nut & Bolt, Inc. |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00245 |
Filed: |
June 29, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
ALAN C KAY |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 14, 2017 |
Filing
371
ORDER DENYING COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS DOUGLAS MOORE, MONARCH INSURANCE SERVICES, INC. AND INSURANCE ASSOCIATES, INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND SUBSTANTIVE JOINDER 313 Motion for Summary Judgment re 317 Motion for Joinder. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 09/14/2017. The Court DENIES Plaintiffs/Counterclaim Defendants Monarch Insurance Services, Inc. and Douglas Moore's Motion for Summary Judgment, to which Insurance Associates Inc. an d Douglas Moore have filed a substantive joinder. ECF Nos. 313 , 315 , 317 . The Motion is DENIED both as to the issue of the Brokers' duties to HNB and also as to the recoverability of HNB and Safeways attorneys' fees in the instant cou nterclaim action and the Insurer's declaratory judgment action. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|
August 8, 2017 |
Filing
350
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re 349 Findings and Recommendations That Plaintiffs And Counterclaim Defendants American Automobile Insurance Co. And National Surety Corp.'s Petition For Determination Of Good Faith Settlements, And Joinders Thereto, Be Granted.. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 08/08/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|
February 16, 2017 |
Filing
244
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS/COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION'S MOTION FOR AN ORDER COMPELLING PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS BY SAFEWAY, INC. AND HAWAII NUT & BOL T, INC. re 191 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 2/16/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
January 9, 2017 |
Filing
200
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS/COUNTERCLAIM PLAINTIFF SAFEWAY INC.'S MOTION TO COMPEL DOCUMENTS FROM PLAINTIFFS/COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AND NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION re 146 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 1/9/2017. "In accordance with the foregoing, Safeway's Motion to Compel, filed October 20, 2016, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Any supplemental responses d irected by the Court shall be provided to Safeway by January 27, 2017. FF is to provide the Court with an unredacted version of Safeway's Exhibit L by January 16, 2017." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
December 16, 2016 |
Filing
193
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS AMERICAN AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY'S AND NATIONAL SURETY CORPORATION'S MOTION TO DISMISS BREACH OF CONTRACT AND REFORMATION COUNTERCLAIMS IN SECOND AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM re 104 Motion to Dismiss for Failu re to State a Claim. Signed by JUDGE ALAN C. KAY on 12/16/2016. --The Court GRANTS FFIC's Motion to Dismiss. The Court GRANTS FFIC's Motion to Dismiss Count I: Breach of Contract of the SACC WITHOUT PREJUDICE and with leave to amend and GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss Count IV: Reformation WITHOUT PREJUDICE and with leave to amend.Safeway and HNB must file any amended complaint within thirty days of the entry of this Order. Any amended complaint must co rrect the deficiencies noted in this Order. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?