Noetzel v. Hawaii Medical Service Association
Petitioner: |
Elizabeth Noetzel |
Respondent: |
Hawaii Medical Service Association |
Case Number: |
1:2015cv00310 |
Filed: |
August 7, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
BARRY M. KURREN |
Presiding Judge: |
SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 21, 2017 |
Filing
70
ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON NOETZEL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re (38 in 1:15-cv-00317-SOM-KJM, 57 in 1:15-cv-00310-SOM-KJM) - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 2/21/2017. "This court concludes that HMSA has identified relev ant information demonstrating that there is some basis to believe that the information sought exists and that such information is essential to oppose the motion. Accordingly, pursuant to Rule 56(d), this court continues the hearing on Noetzel 039;s motion for summary judgment to July 10, 2017, to allow time for discovery. HMSA may file a supplemental opposition brief of no more than 1,500 words by June 13, 2017. Noetzel may file a supplemental reply brief of no more than 750 words by J une 20, 2017." Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00310-SOM-KJM, 1:15-cv-00317-SOM-KJM (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
December 27, 2016 |
Filing
56
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT HAWAII MEDICAL SERVICE ASSOCIATION'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT re granting (41) Motion for Partial Summary Judgment in case 1:15-cv-00310-SOM-KJM - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY o n 12/27/2016. "HMSA's motion for partial summary judgment is granted. No later than January 13, 2017, each party is directed to file a statement of no more than 500 words of what issues remain to be adjudicated and what proce edings are proposed in this case prior to entry of judgment." Associated Cases: 1:15-cv-00310-SOM-KJM, 1:15-cv-00317-SOM-KJM (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive elec tronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
July 27, 2016 |
Filing
40
ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER FILED ON APRIL 27, 2016 re 25 - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 7/27/2016. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive elec tronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
April 27, 2016 |
Filing
23
ORDER REJECTING THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT ELIZABETH NOETZEL'S MOTION TO REMAND re 16 , 17 - Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 4/27/2016. "Because HMSA has shown that Noetzel 's claim is completely preempted by ERISA § 502(a), this court rejects the Magistrate Judge's Findings & Recommendation to Grant Plaintiff Elizabeth Noetzel's Motion to Remand. Noetzel's Motion to Remand is denied." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?