East West Bank v. Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC
Plaintiff: East West Bank
Defendant: Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC, Gunil Kim, Doo Sup Byun, Honolulu, City and County of, State of Hawaii, Soo Kyung Yang, JCCHO Hawaii LLC, George W. Van Buren, John Does 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Doe Entities 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10 and Dong Woo Lee
Case Number: 1:2016cv00022
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
2 Judge: BARRY M KURREN
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2017 Filing 85 STATEMENT Release of Notice of Pendency of Action filed by East West Bank. (Pettit, Ted)
October 16, 2017 Filing 84 EO: COURT ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 27, 2017 Filing 83 STATUS REPORT by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ito, Allison)
September 13, 2017 Filing 82 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING STATUS REPORTS. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 9, 2017 Filing 81 STATUS REPORT by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Choi, Chuck)
July 28, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE of Dismissal Notice of Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint as to George W. Van Buren East West Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pettit, Ted)
July 14, 2016 Filing 79 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR (1) SUMMARY JUDGMENT, INTERLOCUTORY DECREE OF FORECLOSURE, AND APPOINTMENT OF FORECLOSURE COMMISSIONER AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, (2) FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT SOO KYUNG YANG. terminating #67 Motion for Summary Judgment. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 8, 2016 Filing 78 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CIV NO. 16-00022 LEK-KSC on all further filings. (eps)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
July 8, 2016 Filing 77 EP: Status Conference Re #73 Defendant Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC's Notice of Automatic Stay held. This case is STAYED. (See Doc. 75.) Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver (Doc. 8) is TERMINATED.The Debtor shall file a status report no later than 1/9/2017. If the stay should be lifted, counsel shall notify the Court and request a Scheduling Conference.This case shall be reassigned to another magistrate judge. (Chambers no record 10:00-10:15am.) ( BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 28, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Roy F. Epstein on behalf of Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC on behalf of Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. (Epstein, Roy)
June 27, 2016 Filing 75 EO: COURT ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 22, 2016 Filing 74 EO: In light of the #73 Notice of Automatic Stay, the Further Hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver and the Further Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2016 are VACATED. A Status Conference Re #73 Defendant Cuzco Development U.S.A., LLC's Notice of Automatic Stay is set for 7/8/2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Barry M. Kurren. This Status Conference will be held in Judge Barry M. Kurren's chambers on the third floor of the federal courthouse. ( BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 21, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC [Notice of Automatic Stay; Exhibit A; Certificate of Service] Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ito, Allison) Modified docket text appearance on 6/23/2016 (ecs, ).
June 15, 2016 Filing 72 WITHDRAWAL AND SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT JCCHO HAWAII LLC. Signed by BARRY M. KURREN on 6/15/2016. ** Attorney Jeffery Steven Flores and Jerrold K. Guben terminated. (ecs, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 14, 2016 ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the docket number #71 Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant JCCHO Hawaii LLC filed by JCCHO Hawaii LLC may be submitted by e-mail to Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren (kurren_orders@hid.uscourts.gov) for consideration. The filing party refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations and LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (emt, )
June 13, 2016 Filing 71 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Substitution of Counsel for Defendant JCCHO Hawaii LLC Jerrold K. Guben appearing for Defendant JCCHO Hawaii LLC (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Guben, Jerrold)
June 13, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment Interlocutory Decree of Foreclosure, and Appointment of Foreclosure Commissioner Against All Defendants, or, in the Alternative, (2) for Default Judgment Against Defendant Soo Kyung Yang (Hearing: July 29, 2016, Time: 2: : Motion Hearing set for 7/29/2016 at 02:30 PM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
June 13, 2016 Filing 69 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by East West Bank re #68 Concise Statement of Facts,,, #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment Interlocutory Decree of Foreclosure, and Appointment of Foreclosure Commissioner Against All Defendants, or, in the Alternative, (2) for Default Judgment Against Defendant Soo Kyung Yang (Hearing: July 29, 2016, Time: 2: (Pettit, Ted)
June 13, 2016 Filing 68 CONCISE STATEMENT of Facts re #67 MOTION for Summary Judgment Interlocutory Decree of Foreclosure, and Appointment of Foreclosure Commissioner Against All Defendants, or, in the Alternative, (2) for Default Judgment Against Defendant Soo Kyung Yang (Hearing: July 29, 2016, Time: 2: filed by East West Bank. (Attachments: #1 Concise Statement of Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Certificate of Word Count, #3 Declaration of L. Kurth Demoss, #4 Exhibit "A", #5 Exhibit "B", #6 Exhibit "C", #7 Exhibit "D", #8 Exhibit "E", #9 Exhibit "F", #10 Exhibit "G", #11 Exhibit "H", #12 Exhibit "I", #13 Exhibit "J", #14 Exhibit "K", #15 Exhibit "L", #16 Declaration of Ted N. Pettit, #17 Exhibit "1", #18 Exhibit "2")(Pettit, Ted)
June 13, 2016 Filing 67 MOTION for Summary Judgment Interlocutory Decree of Foreclosure, and Appointment of Foreclosure Commissioner Against All Defendants, or, in the Alternative, (2) for Default Judgment Against Defendant Soo Kyung Yang (Hearing: July 29, 2016, Time: 2:30 pm, Judge: Honorable Leslie E. Kobayashi) Ted N. Pettit appearing for Plaintiff East West Bank (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Pettit, Ted)
June 9, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE by East West Bank Notice of Withdrawal of Dana R. Lyons as Counsel for East West Bank, a California Commercial Bank East West Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pettit, Ted)
June 3, 2016 Filing 65 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings FURTH HRG ON #8 PLTFF'S M/APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER; FURTH RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONF held on 5/31/16 - before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cynthia Fazio, Telephone number 808.541.2063. 90-Day Transcript Restriction: PACER access to filed transcripts is restricted for 90 days from the file date to permit redaction of personal identifiers. Citations to restricted transcripts in filed documents must be limited to those portions of the proceedings that are relevant and in need of judicial review. Attaching restricted transcripts, in their entirety, to filed documents should be limited to situations with specific need. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript. Redaction Request due 6/21/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2016. (14 pp.) (cf@hid.uscourts.gov)
May 31, 2016 Filing 63 EP: Further Hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver held. Further Rule 16 Scheduling Conference not held.The Further Hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver and the Further Rule 16 Scheduling Conference are CONTINUED to 6/30/2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Barry M. Kurren.Currently, Judge Leslie Kobayashi is available on 7/25/2016 to hear dispositive motions. Ted N. Pettit shall contact Judge Kobayashi's Courtroom Manager (Warren Nakamura, 541-1894) as soon as possible, to discuss a hearing date and time. Roy F. Epstein shall file a Notice of Appearance as soon as possible.(C8F 1:03-1:16pm.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 25, 2016 Filing 62 EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Further Hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver and the Further Rule 16 Scheduling Conference, which were set for 5/31/2016 at 10:00am, are MOVED to 1:00pm on that same date before Judge Barry M. Kurren. This hearing will be held in Courtroom 8. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
May 25, 2016 Filing 61 STATEMENT of No Opposition re #8 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Honolulu, City and County of, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ota, Ryan)
April 19, 2016 Filing 60 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. A Further Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 5/31/2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Judge Barry M. Kurren. This Conference will be held at the same time as the Further Hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver. (C8 no record 9:25-9:45am.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 18, 2016 Filing 59 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Soo Kyung Yang re: ECF NO. #58 Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Soo Kyung Yang (eps)
April 18, 2016 Filing 58 MOTION for Entry of Default Request for Entry of Default Against Defendant Soo Kyung Yang Ted N. Pettit appearing for Plaintiff East West Bank (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ted N. Pettit, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Certificate of Service)(Pettit, Ted)
April 15, 2016 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JCCHO Hawaii LLC re #56 Answer to Crossclaim (AMENDED) (Flores, Jeffery)
April 14, 2016 Filing 56 ANSWER to #41 Crossclaim,,, by JCCHO Hawaii LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Guben, Jerrold)
April 12, 2016 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC re #53 Scheduling Conference Statement [Amended Certificate of Service re Cuzco's Scheduling Conference Statement] (Verbrugge, Neil)
April 12, 2016 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC re #52 Certificate of Service [Amended Certificate of Service re Initial Disclosures] (Verbrugge, Neil)
April 12, 2016 Filing 53 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Verbrugge, Neil)
April 12, 2016 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC (Initial Disclosures) (Verbrugge, Neil)
April 12, 2016 Filing 51 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ota, Ryan)
April 12, 2016 Filing 50 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Honolulu, City and County of, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ota, Ryan)
April 12, 2016 Filing 49 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lyons, Dana)
April 12, 2016 Filing 48 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Flores, Jeffery)
April 11, 2016 Filing 47 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by JCCHO Hawaii LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Flores, Jeffery)
April 11, 2016 Filing 46 REPORT of Planning Meeting Report of the Parties' Conference. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lyons, Dana)
April 11, 2016 Filing 45 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by East West Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lyons, Dana)
April 5, 2016 Filing 44 Summons On Cross-Claim Issued as to Soo Kyung Yang. (eps )
April 4, 2016 Filing 43 Summons (Proposed) (Flores, Jeffery)
March 28, 2016 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC re #41 Crossclaim,,, #40 Answer to Complaint (Verbrugge, Neil)
March 24, 2016 Filing 41 CROSSCLAIM against Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Entities 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, JCCHO Hawaii LLC, CROSSCLAIM against Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Entities 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, JCCHO Hawaii LLC, filed by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC.(Verbrugge, Neil) Docket Text Modified on 3/31/2016 (eps).
March 24, 2016 Filing 40 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC.(Verbrugge, Neil)
March 18, 2016 Filing 39 ANSWER to #30 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim,, by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wong, Jason)
March 18, 2016 Filing 38 CLAIM Cross-Claim by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wong, Jason)
March 18, 2016 ADVISORY ENTRY. The filing party notified the Clerk's Office of the inadvertent error as to the selection of the filing event "Claim" as to Docket entry number #38 Claim filed by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. The Clerk's Office instructed the filing party to re-file, selecting the filing event "Answer" re #39 Answer to Crossclaim filed by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. Counsel has re-submitted, no further action necessary. (eps)
March 11, 2016 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by East West Bank. Soo Kyung Yang served on 2/26/2016, answer due 3/18/2016. (Pettit, Ted)
March 8, 2016 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings FURTH HRG ON #8 PLTFF'S M/APPT OF RECEIVER held on 3/4/16 - before Judge BARRY M. KURREN. Court Reporter/Transcriber Cynthia Fazio, Telephone number 808.541.2063. 90-Day Transcript Restriction: PACER access to filed transcripts is restricted for 90 days from the file date to permit redaction of personal identifiers. Citations to restricted transcripts in filed documents must be limited to those portions of the proceedings that are relevant and in need of judicial review. Attaching restricted transcripts, in their entirety, to filed documents should be limited to situations with specific need. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or ordered through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript. Redaction Request due 3/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2016. (18 pp) (cf@hid.uscourts.gov) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/8/2016: #1 Main Document Transcript AMD) (cf@, hid.uscourts.gov).
March 4, 2016 Filing 35 EP: FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE and FURTHER HEARING ON #8 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF RECEIVER held.No settlement at this time.Arguments on #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver heard.Chuck C. Choi to submit written report by Friday 05/27/2016.Further Hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver is 05/31/2016 @ 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren.(BMK Chambers (settlement) / C7 FTR 10:24 - 10:43 (motion).) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(bbb)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 3, 2016 Filing 34 EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/28/2016 is CONTINUED to 4/19/2016 at 9:30AM before Judge Barry M. Kurren. Scheduling Conference Statements are due 4/12/2016. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 1, 2016 Filing 33 EP: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE held.Counsel Chuck C. Choi and Neil J. Verbrugge appearing on behalf of Defendant Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. Counsel David Y. Suh appearing on behalf of Defendant JCCHO Hawaii LLC.No settlement at this time.Further Settlement Conference is set for 03/04/2016 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Barry M. Kurren. (FTR-Ctrm BMK Chambers 1:30 - 3:45.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(bbb)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 1, 2016 Filing 32 Third Party Complaint Summons Issued as to Dong Woo Lee. (eps )
February 29, 2016 Filing 31 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT filed by JCCHO Hawaii LLC against Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Entities 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Dong Woo Lee, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Entities 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Dong Woo Lee, filed by JCCHO Hawaii LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons)(Guben, Jerrold) Docket Text Modified on 3/1/2016 (eps ).
February 29, 2016 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Entities 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Soo Kyung Yang by JCCHO Hawaii LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cross-Claim Against Defendants, #2 Certificate of Service)(Guben, Jerrold)
February 25, 2016 Filing 29 EO: Due to a conflict in the court's schedule, the Further hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver previously set for 11:00 a.m. IS ADVANCED TO 10:00 a.m. on the same date before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(bbb)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 23, 2016 Filing 28 EP: Hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver held. The Court CONTINUES the hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion to March 4, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. The Court schedules a Settlement Conference for March 1, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements are due by February 26, 2016.(FTR-Ctrm C7F, 9:58-10:28 A.M.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur1)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 19, 2016 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by East West Bank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan M. Hamaguchi, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B", #4 Exhibit "C", #5 Exhibit "D", #6 Exhibit "E", #7 Exhibit "F", #8 Exhibit "G", #9 Exhibit "H", #10 Exhibit "I")(Pettit, Ted)
February 17, 2016 Filing 26 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Honolulu, City and County of, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ota, Ryan)
February 12, 2016 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JCCHO Hawaii LLC re #24 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Flores, Jeffery)
February 12, 2016 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by JCCHO Hawaii LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jae Hyon Cho, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Guben, Jerrold)
February 12, 2016 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiff East West Bank's Motion for Appointment of Receiver filed by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dong Woo Lee, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Declaration Declaration of Kay Nakano, #18 Exhibit Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit Exhibit S, #22 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Wong, Jason)
February 11, 2016 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerrold K. Guben on behalf of JCCHO Hawaii LLC on behalf of JCCHO Hawaii LLC. (Guben, Jerrold)
February 11, 2016 Filing 21 STATEMENT of No Opposition re #8 MOTION to Appoint Receiver filed by Honolulu, City and County of, State of Hawaii. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ota, Ryan)
February 8, 2016 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by East West Bank. (Pettit, Ted)
February 4, 2016 Filing 19 NOTICE by East West Bank re #8 MOTION to Appoint Receiver , 18 Order on Ex Parte Motion, Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings (inc F&R),,,,,, Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff East West Bank's Motion for Appointment of Receiver East West Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pettit, Ted)
February 4, 2016 Filing 18 EO: The Court GRANTS IN PART #9 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time for Hearing on Motion for Appointment of Receiver. The following Motion is set for hearing on the next available date, which is 2/23/2016 at 10:00AM before Judge Barry M. Kurren: #8 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Receiver. Any Opposition is due 2/12/2016; any Reply is due 2/19/2016. Courtesy copies of the Opposition and Reply shall be submitted to the Court no later than noon on 2/22/2016. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(kur2 )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 4, 2016 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by East West Bank. JCCHO Hawaii LLC served on 1/28/2016, answer due 2/18/2016. (Pettit, Ted)
February 2, 2016 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by East West Bank. George W. Van Buren waiver sent on 2/2/2016, answer due 4/4/2016. (Pettit, Ted)
February 1, 2016 Filing 14 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by East West Bank. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pettit, Ted)
February 1, 2016 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wong, Jason)
February 1, 2016 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by East West Bank. Honolulu, City and County of, State of Hawaii served on 1/28/2016, answer due 2/18/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A")(Pettit, Ted)
January 29, 2016 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by East West Bank. Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC waiver sent on 1/29/2016, answer due 3/29/2016. (Pettit, Ted)
January 29, 2016 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason G.F. Wong on behalf of Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC on behalf of Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wong, Jason)
January 27, 2016 Filing 9 EX PARTE Motion to Shorten Time for Notice on Hearing for Motion for Appointment of Receiver (DKT 8) Dana R. Lyons appearing for Plaintiff East West Bank (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dana R. Lyons, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lyons, Dana)
January 27, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Ted N. Pettit appearing for Plaintiff East West Bank (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Kurth L. Demoss, #3 Exhibit "A", #4 Exhibit "B", #5 Exhibit "C", #6 Exhibit "D", #7 Exhibit "E", #8 Exhibit "F", #9 Exhibit "G", #10 Exhibit "H", #11 Exhibit "I", #12 Exhibit "J", #13 Exhibit "K", #14 Declaration of Ted N. Pettit, #15 Exhibit "1", #16 Exhibit "2", #17 Exhibit "3", #18 Exhibit "4", #19 Exhibit "5", #20 Exhibit "6", #21 Exhibit "7", #22 Exhibit "8", #23 Exhibit "9", #24 Exhibit "10", #25 Exhibit "11", #26 Exhibit "12", #27 Exhibit "13", #28 Exhibit "14", #29 Notice to Attorneys Notice of Hearing)(Pettit, Ted)
January 27, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE by East West Bank Notice of Pendency of Action East West Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Property Description)(Pettit, Ted)
January 26, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CIV NO. 16-00022LEK-BMK on all further filings. (eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
January 26, 2016 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet (Attachments: #1 A0 398 Notice of a Lawsuit, #2 A0 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eps )
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30AM on 3/28/2016 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN.. By CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 01/26/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memo re: Corporate Disclosures)(eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO: Re CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THIS DOCUMENT.
January 26, 2016 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (eps )
January 26, 2016 Notice to Non E-Filer - The Clerk's Office will no longer serve the attorneys at Case Lombardi & Pettit via both paper and electronic service. The Clerk's Office will only serve electronically to the email addresses of record in this case. On January 1, 2014, the court implemented mandatory electronic filing (see Local Rule 100.2.2 for exceptions). Attorneys were given a 90-day grace period in order to have a chance to take the electronic filing training provided by the court. The 90-day grace period ended on March 31, 2104. Although attorney Ryan M. Hamaguchi has not filed documents, as counsel of record a Notice of Electronic Filing is generated. To receive notices and to comply with the local rules, review the CM/ECF application, complete applicable training (Computer Based Training (CBT) and register for CM/ECF at CM/ECF Resources, www.hid.uscourts.gov..(eps )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry.
January 21, 2016 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Pettit, Ted)
January 21, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Exhibits "A" - "H"; Summons to Answer Civil Complaint against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1659102.), filed by East West Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A", #2 Exhibit "B", #3 Exhibit "C", #4 Exhibit "D", #5 Exhibit "E", #6 Exhibit "F", #7 Exhibit "G", #8 Exhibit "H", #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pettit, Ted)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: East West Bank v. Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cuzco Development, U.S.A., LLC
Represented By: Jason G.F. Wong
Represented By: Neil J. Verbrugge
Represented By: Chuck C. Choi
Represented By: Allison A. Ito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gunil Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doo Sup Byun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honolulu, City and County of, State of Hawaii
Represented By: Duane W.H. Pang
Represented By: Ryan H. Ota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Kyung Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JCCHO Hawaii LLC
Represented By: David Y. Suh
Represented By: Jeffery Steven Flores
Represented By: Jerrold K. Guben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Van Buren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dong Woo Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East West Bank
Represented By: Dana R. Lyons
Represented By: Ryan M. Hamaguchi
Represented By: Ted N. Pettit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?