Gramercy Group Inc. v. D.A. Builders, LLC
Plaintiff: |
Gramercy Group, Inc. |
Defendant: |
D.A. Builders, LLC, David A. Alcos, III and John Does 1-20 |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00114 |
Filed: |
March 14, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 21, 2019 |
Filing
636
ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 5/21/2019. For the reasons stated above, the Court directs the Clerk to enter judgment in Gramercy's favor and against D.A. Builders pursuant to FRCP 54(b). (emt, )
|
November 27, 2018 |
Filing
478
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE COUNT IX OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re: 467 . Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 11/26/2018. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held November 26, 2018; minutes of hearing: ECF 475 .
|
October 23, 2018 |
Filing
395
ORDER (1) DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND THE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS IN LIMINE 379 AND (2) GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND THE SIXTH AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER TO PERMIT THE FILIN G OF THREE ADDITIONAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE 380 .Excerpt of conclusion: "Defendants' deadline to file their motions in limine is October 25, 2018, and Plaintiffs response deadline is October 29, 2018." Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 10/22/2018. (afc)
|
March 9, 2018 |
Filing
285
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF GRAMERCY GROUP INC.'S MOTIONS FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, ECF NOS. 98 , 100 , 102 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/9/2018. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held March 5, 20 18. Minutes of hearing: ECF 283 . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
November 9, 2017 |
Filing
176
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER re 124 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 11/9/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic not ifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
November 8, 2017 |
Filing
173
ORDER Granting In Part And Denying In Part Defendants' (1) Motion To Compel Deposition Testimony Of Vincent Parziale And (2) Motion To Compel Deposition Testimony Of Gregg Jenkinson And Craig Lebel. " Based on the foregoing, Defendants Moti ons (Doc. Nos. 130 & 137 ) are HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART."Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 11/8/17. (cib, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic not ifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?