Sanact, Inc. v. U.S. Pipelining LLC
Plaintiff: Sanact, Inc.
Defendant: U.S. Pipelining LLC, John Does 1-5, Jane Does 1-5, Doe Corporations 1-5, Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-5, Doe Partnerships 1-5 and Doe Entities 1-5
Case Number: 1:2016cv00377
Filed: July 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT PLAINTIFF SANACT, INC., dba ROTO ROOTER'S MOTION FOR AN AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND RELATED NON-TAXABLE EXPENSES (ECF NO. 84 ) AS MODIFIED - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 10/1/2018. (emt, )
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 FINDINGS OF FACT, CONCLUSIONS OF LAW, AND ORDER - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 7/26/2018. Based upon the evidence and the Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law stated herein, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AN D DECREED: 1. Sanact and US Pipelining entered into a binding contract. 2. US Pipelining breached the contract when it failed to pay Sanact for the work Sanact performed from October 6, 2015 through November 9, 2015. 3. Sanact i s entitled to judgment against US Pipelining in the amount of $123,203.16. 4. Sanact is entitled to recover prejudgment interest at a rate of 10% a year beginning on December 9, 2015. 5. Sanact is the prevailing party and is ent itled to attorneys' fees in assumpsit pursuant to Haw. Rev. Stat. § 607- 14. Sanact shall file a Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Related Non-taxable Expenses within 14 days of entry of judgment. 6. Sanact is entitled to recover post-judgment interest as set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1961. (emt, )
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER ON JURISDICTION AND VENUE - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 6/29/2018. The Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over the proceeding based on diversity jurisdiction. Venue is proper in the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii. Defendant has waived any challenge to the Court's jurisdiction and venue based on the forum-selection clause pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h). Defendant is also estopped from raising such challenges as it has taken clearly inconsistent positions in the litigation to the Plaintiff's detriment. (emt, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanact, Inc. v. U.S. Pipelining LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Pipelining LLC
Represented By: Peter A. Horovitz
Represented By: David B. Merchant
Represented By: Kristine K. Tsukiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Limited Liability Companies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanact, Inc.
Represented By: Keith D. Kirschbraun
Represented By: Deborah K. Wright
Represented By: Douglas R. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?