Isaac v. Ari Daniels et al
Plaintiff: Isaam Isaac
Defendant: Ari Daniels, Doe Defendants 3-10, Doe Defendants 1-10 and Jerry Kmiec
Case Number: 1:2016cv00507
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 Filing 68 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re #64 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT, #65 CLERK'S AMENDED JUDGMENT). Mail sent to Ari Daniels at 10162 Arkell Court, Las Vegas, NV 89183-4273 returned undeliverable. The Clerk's Office will resend the documents to Mr. Daniels at 757 Orchard Course Dr., Las Vegas, NV 89148-4479 on January 9, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Motion to Modify Judgment and Directing Entry of Amended Judgment, ECF No. 64, #2 Amended Judgment, ECF No. 65) (emt, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE of Dismissal With Prejudice Of The "First Amended Complaint As Of Right" (filed February 7, 2017; Doc. No. 15) As Against Defendant Ari Daniels Only Isaam Isaac. (Osaki, Carl)
January 3, 2019 Filing 66 Letter from Carl H. Osaki, Esq., dated December 19, 2018 Re: Notification to Court regarding consultation with Aaron McKown, Esq., counsel for Ari Daniels re notice of dismissal of claims against Ari Daniels. (emt, )
January 3, 2019 Filing 65 CLERK'S AMENDED JUDGMENT entered on 1/3/2019 pursuant to ECF No. #64 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT. (emt, )
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT re #59 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 1/3/2019. The Judgment of September 12, 2018, Dkt. No. 58, is VACATED. The Clerk is instructed to enter an amended judgment forthwith as follows: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff Isaam Isaac and against Defendant Jerry Kmiec, pursuant to, and in accordance with the following orders: "Findings and Recommendation to Grant in Part and Deny in Part Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as to Count I of the First Amended Complaint," filed June 23, 2017, ECF No. 31; the "Order Adopting Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation," filed July 11, 2017, ECF No. 33; "Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice of All Remaining Claims and Parties," filed September 12, 2018, ECF No. 57; and "Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Modify Judgment and Directing Entry of Amended Judgment," filed January 3, 2019, Dkt. No. 64. Finally, Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a notice of dismissal with respect to Defendant Ari Daniels on or before January 18, 2019. (emt, )
January 3, 2019 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #64 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT and #65 Clerk's Amended Judgment has been served by First Class Mail to Jerry Kmiec at 3478 Paradise Road, Apt. 164, Las Vegas, NV 89169 and Ari Daniels at 21781 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 231, Woodland Hills, CA 91364 and 10162 Arkell Court, Las Vegas, NV 89183-4273 on January 3, 2019. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 63 EP: Status Conference held on 12/19/2018. Discussion held.Mr. Osaki to discuss with Defendant Ari Daniels' counsel the proposal to set aside the judgment against Defendant Ari Daniels, to amend the judgment as to Defendant Jerry Kmiec and filed a Notice of Dismissal as to Defendant Ari Daniels and notify the court of Defendant's position. (Court Reporter Gloria Bediamol) (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
December 18, 2018 Filing 62 EO: Status Conference is set for 12/19/2018 at 09:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
November 27, 2018 Filing 61 REPLY re #59 MOTION to Amend/Correct #58 Clerk's Judgment In A Civil Case, Filed September 12, 2018, 60 Link, (Declaration of Carl H. Osaki in Supplemental Support of Motion to Amend to Vacate Judgment as Against Defendant Ari Daniels filed by Isaam Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Osaki, Carl)
November 26, 2018 Filing 60 EO: On 11/21/2018, the Court received Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion To Modify The "Judgment In A Civil Case," Filed September 12, 2018 (Doc. 58), and To Vacate It As It Applies To Defendant Ari Daniels, Only. Any interested party is directed to file a response, if any, to Plaintiff's Motion by 12/3/2018. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d), the Court elects to decide the motion on the pleadings without a hearing. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
November 21, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION to Amend/Correct #58 Clerk's Judgment In A Civil Case, Filed September 12, 2018 Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Carl H. Osaki, #3 Exhibit A)(Osaki, Carl)
September 13, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #57 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ALL REMAINING CLAIMS AND PARTIES and #58 Clerk's Judgment have been served by First Class Mail to Jerry Kmiec at 3478 Paradise Road, Apt. 164, Las Vegas, NV 89169 and Ari Daniels at 21781 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 231, Woodland Hills, CA 91364 and 10162 Arkell Court, Las Vegas, NV 89183-4273 on September 13, 2018. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, ) Modified on 9/13/2018 (emt, ).
September 12, 2018 Filing 58 (vacated, pursuant to ECF No. #64 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO MODIFY JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF AMENDED JUDGMENT): CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 9/12/2018 pursuant to #31 , #33 , #55 , #56 , #57 . (emt, ) Modified on 1/3/2019 (emt, ).
September 12, 2018 Filing 57 PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ALL REMAINING CLAIMS AND PARTIES - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/12/2018. All remaining claims and parties in the First Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(I) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (emt, )
April 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION re #55 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/20/2018. (emt, )
April 20, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the #56 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION shall be served by First Class Mail to Jerry Kmiec at 3478 Paradise Road, Apt. 164, Las Vegas, NV 89169 and Ari Daniels to the following addresses: 21781 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 231, Woodland Hills, CA 91364 and 10162 Arkell Court, Las Vegas, NV 89183-4273 on April 20, 2018. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
April 2, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #55 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS To Grant In Part and Deny In Part Plaintiff's Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant Ari Daniels As To Count I Of The First Amended Complaint has been served by First Class Mail to Jerry Kmiec at 3478 Paradise Road, Apt. 164, Las Vegas, NV 89169 and Ari Daniels to the following addresses: 21781 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 231, Woodland Hills, CA 91364 and 10162 Arkell Court, Las Vegas, NV 89183-4273 on April 2, 2018. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
March 30, 2018 Filing 55 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS To Grant In Part and Deny In Part Plaintiff's Motion For Default Judgment Against Defendant Ari Daniels As To Count I Of The First Amended Complaint #53 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 3/30/18. (cib, )
March 19, 2018 Filing 54 EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d), the Court elects to decide #53 Second Motion for Default Judgment without a hearing. Briefing shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.4. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(nab)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 16, 2018 Filing 53 Second MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant Ari Daniels Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support Of Motion, #2 Declaration of Carl H. Osaki, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q)(Osaki, Carl)
March 5, 2018 Filing 52 EO: Based on counsel's request, the deadline to file a motion for default judgment is CONTINUED to March 16, 2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
March 5, 2018 Filing 51 EO: Based on counsel's request, the deadline to file a motion for default judgment is CONTINUED to March 9, 2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 21, 2018 Filing 50 Scheduling Conference Statement by Plaintiff Isaam Isaac. (Osaki, Carl)
February 16, 2018 Filing 49 EO: Because all Defendants have defaulted, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/28/2018 before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi is VACATED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 16, 2018 Filing 48 EO: Based on counsel's request, the deadline to file a motion for default judgment is CONTINUED to March 5, 2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 25, 2018 Filing 47 EO: Based on counsel's request, the deadline to file a motion for default judgment is CONTINUED to February 16, 2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
December 19, 2017 Filing 46 ENTRY OF DEFAULT of Defendant Ari Daniels as to the Amended Complaint, filed February 10, 2017 re #45 Amended Request for Entry of Default. (emt, )
December 18, 2017 Filing 45 Amended MOTION REQUEST for Entry of Default Of Defendant Ari Daniels Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carl H. Osaki, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Entry of Default)(Osaki, Carl) Modified on 12/19/2017 (emt, ).
December 18, 2017 Filing 44 EP: Service by Publication Return Date Hearing held on 12/18/2017. 3 calls were made. Ari Daniels not present. Plaintiff's counsel requests that default be entered. Counsel for Plaintiff shall file his request for entry of default by December 19, 2017. Motion for default judgment shall be filed January 26, 2018. (Court Reporter FTR - C5) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 24, 2017 Filing 43 SERVICE by Publication filed by Isaam Isaac. Last publication date 11/21/2017. (emt, )
October 27, 2017 Filing 42 AFFIDAVIT of Carl H. Osaki Re: Status Of Service Of Process by Isaam Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Osaki, Carl)
October 24, 2017 Filing 41 Summons Issued as to Ari Daniels. (emt, )
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION FOR PERMISSION TO SERVE DEFENDANT ARI DANIELS VIA PUBLICATION re #39 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 10/24/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Carl Osaki, Esq. served electronically.
October 23, 2017 Filing 39 EX PARTE Motion For Permission To Serve Defendant Ari Daniels Via Publication Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carl H. Osaki)(Osaki, Carl)
October 11, 2017 Filing 38 EO: The Court has reviewed #36 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Fourth Extension of Time to Serve Complaint Upon Defendant Ari Daniels and #37 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Permission to Serve Defendant Ari Daniels Via Certified Mail and ORDERS as follows:Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(e)(1) and Hawaii Revised Statutes Sections 634-23 and 634-24, the Court GRANTS #37 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Serve Defendant Ari Daniels Via Certified Mail. Regarding #36 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Fourth Extension of Time to Serve Complaint, although Plaintiff has established good cause to extend the time to serve, the Court finds that the requested 180-day extension is excessive. This action was filed more than a year ago. The most recent service attempts were made in July 2017; however, Plaintiff waited until October 2017 to file the present motions. The Court extends the time to serve up to and including 12/18/2017. In light of the extension of time to serve, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 12/7/2017 to 2/28/2018 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 2/21/2018. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
October 10, 2017 Filing 37 EX PARTE Motion For Permission To Serve Defendant Ari Daniels Via Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested, With Delivery Restricted To Daniels Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carl H. Osaki)(Osaki, Carl)
October 10, 2017 Filing 36 EX PARTE Motion For Fourth Extension Of Time To Serve Complaint Upon Defendant Ari Daniels Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carl H. Osaki, #2 Exhibit A)(Osaki, Carl)
July 13, 2017 Filing 35 EO: A Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/7/2017 in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 11/30/2017. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 12, 2017 Filing 34 EO: The Court has reviewed #32 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Third Extension of Time to Serve Complaint Upon Defendant Ari Daniels and finds that Plaintiff has established good cause to extend the time for service. However, the Court finds that the requested 180-day extension is excessive and instead extends the the time to serve up to and including 10/10/2017.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(bs) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #31 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/11/2017. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Jerry Kmiec shall be served by first class mail to 3478 Paradise Road, Apt. 164, Las Vegas, NV 89169 (see ECF No. 18 ) and Ari Daniels shall be served by first class mail to the following addresses: 21781 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 231, Woodland Hills, CA 91364 (see ECF No. 22 ) and 10162 Arkell Court, Las Vegas, NV 89183-4273 (see ECF No. 21 ) on July 11, 2017.
July 6, 2017 Filing 32 EX PARTE Motion For Third Extension Of Time To Serve Complaint Upon Defendant Ari Daniels Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carl H. Osaki, #2 Exhibit A)(Osaki, Carl)
June 26, 2017 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT shall be served, by first class mail, on June 26, 2017, to Jerry Kmiec at 3478 Paradise Road, Apt. 164, Las Vegas, NV 89169 (see ECF No. #18 ) and Ari Daniels at the following addresses: 21781 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 231, Woodland Hills, CA 91364 (see ECF No. #22 ) and 10162 Arkell Court, Las Vegas, NV 89183-4273 (see ECF No. #21 ). Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
June 23, 2017 Filing 31 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT IN PART AND DENY IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I OF THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT re #27 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 6/23/2017. "The Court FINDS and RECOMMENDS that Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment as to Count I of the First Amended Complaint be GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: (1) Default judgment be DENIED against Defendant Ari Daniels; (2) The entry of default against Defendant Ari Daniels be VACATED; (3) Default judgment be GRANTED in Plaintiff's favor and against Defendant Jerry Kmiec as to Plaintiff's claim for defamation; (4) Plaintiff be awarded general damages in the amount of $10,000 against Defendant Jerry Kmiec; (5) Plaintiff's requests for nominal damages, special damages, punitive damages, and attorneys fees be DENIED." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Jerry Kmiec and Ari Daniels shall be served by first class mail on June 26, 2017: Jerry Kmiec served at 3478 Paradise Road, Apt. 164, Las Vegas, NV 89169 (see ECF No. 18 ) and Ari Daniels served at the following addresses: 21781 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 231, Woodland Hills, CA 91364 (see ECF No. 22 ) and 10162 Arkell Court, Las Vegas, NV 89183-4273 (see ECF No. 21 ). Modified on 6/26/2017 (emt, ).
June 13, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Please reflect Civil Case Number CIV NO. 16-00507 DKW-RLP on all filings. (eps, )
June 13, 2017 Filing 29 EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d), the Court elects to decide #24 Motion for Default Judgment without a hearing. Briefing shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.4. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 13, 2017 Filing 28 EO: The Court directs the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to a District Judge. Judge Puglisi will remain as the Magistrate Judge. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
June 9, 2017 Filing 27 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Count I of the Amended Complaint Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support, #2 Declaration Of Carl H. Osaki, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Supplement F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O)(Osaki, Carl)
June 5, 2017 Filing 26 EO: Per Plaintiff's counsel's request, the filing of motion for default judgment is extended from 6/05/2017 to 6/09/2017. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 21, 2017 Filing 25 EO: In light of entry of default against both named defendants, see ECF Nos. #20 , #24 , the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/10/2017 is hereby VACATED. Plaintiff shall file a motion for default judgment no later than 6/5/2017. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI) (agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
April 21, 2017 Filing 24 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ari Daniels (eps, )
April 20, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Entry of Default Of Defendant Ari Daniels Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carl H. Osaki, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Entry of Default)(Osaki, Carl)
April 5, 2017 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint (alternate) served on Ari Daniels on March 28, 2017, filed by Isaam Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Osaki, Carl)
April 1, 2017 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Defendant Ari Daniels on March 25, 2017, filed by Isaam Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Osaki, Carl)
March 30, 2017 Filing 20 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Jerry Kmiec ENTRY OF DEFAULT OF DEFENDANT JERRY KMIEC AS TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED FEBRUARY 10, 2017 (eps, )
March 29, 2017 Filing 19 MOTION for Entry of Default of Defendant Jerry Kmiec Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carl H. Osaki, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Entry of Default)(Osaki, Carl)
March 14, 2017 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for amended complaint served on Jerry Kmiec on February 26, 2017, filed by Isaam Isaac. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Osaki, Carl)
March 14, 2017 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Isaam Isaac re 14 Link, Set Hearings,,,, (Osaki, Carl)
February 7, 2017 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Ari Daniels, Jerry Kmiec. (eps, )
February 7, 2017 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ari Daniels, Jerry Kmiec, Doe Defendants 3-10, filed by Isaam Isaac.(eps, )
February 7, 2017 Filing 14 EO: In light of the extension of time to serve complaint, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2016 is CONTINUED to 5/10/2017 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(bs)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 7, 2017 Filing 13 EO: Finding good cause in support thereof, the Court GRANTS 12 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Second Extension of Time to Serve Complaint. The time for service is extended until April 12, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(bs) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 6, 2017 Filing 12 EX PARTE Motion For Second Extension Of Time To Serve Complaint Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carl H. Osaki, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M)(Osaki, Carl)
November 30, 2016 Filing 11 EO: Finding good cause in support thereof, the Court GRANTS #10 Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Complaint. The time for service is extended until February 11, 2017. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 29, 2016 Filing 10 EX PARTE Motion by Plaintiff For Extension Of Time To Serve Complaint Carl H. Osaki appearing for Plaintiff Isaam Isaac (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Carl H. Osaki, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Osaki, Carl)
November 29, 2016 Filing 9 EO: Based on Plaintiff's counsel's request and finding good cause in support thereof, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/7/2016 is CONTINUED to 2/22/2017 at 9:00 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 19, 2016 Filing 8 EO: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/7/2016 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
September 16, 2016 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Doe Defendants 1-10. (eps, )
September 14, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form To Consent)(eps, )
September 14, 2016 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet (Attachments: #1 A0 398 Notice of a Lawsuit, #2 A0 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eps, )
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE : TO BE SET before Magistrate Judge Richard L Puglisi . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 09/14/2016. (Attachments: #1 Memo re: Corporate Disclosures)(eps, )
September 14, 2016 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00,receipt number HI019214 re #1 Complaint (eps, )
September 14, 2016 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Isaam Isaac. (eps, )
September 14, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Doe Defendants 1-10, filed by Isaam Isaac.(eps, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaac v. Ari Daniels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ari Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 3-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Kmiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaam Isaac
Represented By: Carl H. Osaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?