March 15, 2021 |
Filing
354
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 3/15/2021. Based on the 4/1/20 Order and the terms of the parties' settlement, all remaining claims in this case are HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk's Office is therefore DIRECTED to close the case immediately. (emt, )
|
August 8, 2019 |
Filing
226
ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint, For Damages and Declaratory Relief, Filed June 14, 2019 re 203 209 .On the basis of the foregoing, Defendants' June 26, 2019 Motion to D ismiss Third Amended Complaint, for Damages and Declaratory Relief, Filed June 14, 2019 [Dkt. 203], is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED insofar as the Third Amended Complaints request for punitive damages is dismissed, and the Motion is DENIED in all other respects. Defendants are ORDERED to file their answer to the Third Amended Complaint by August 20, 2019. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/8/2019. (cib)
|
June 24, 2019 |
Filing
207
ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment re 155 . On the basis of the foregoing, Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, filed April 3, 2019, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DE NIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED insofar as summary judgment is granted in Defendants' favor as to Counts IV, V, VI, VII, and VIII. The Motion is DENIED as to the UDAP claim in Count III. Thus, this case will proceed to trial on the UDAP claim and the UMOC claim in Count III. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 6/24/2019. (cib)
|
June 4, 2019 |
Filing
193
ORDER Denying Intervenors' Motion To Remove Christopher Zyda As Class Representative, Or In The Alternative, To Prohibit Mr. Zyda From Encouraging Other Class Members To Personally Harass Intervenors re 149 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 6/4/2019. (cib)
|
March 7, 2019 |
Filing
152
ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Motion To Dismiss And For Partial Summary Judgment As To First Claim For Relief (Condominium Property Act) In Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint For Damages, Declar atory, and Injunctive Relief Filed April 30, 2018 re 89 118 . Defendants' October 18, 2018 Motion to Dismiss and for Partial Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief (Condominium Property Act) in Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint for Damages, Declaratory, and Injunctive Relief Filed April 30, 2018, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion is DENIED as to Defendants' request to dismiss Count I, and the Motion is GRANTED insofar as s ummary judgment is GRANTED in favor of Defendants as to Meyer's claim in Count I. Further, the Class is HEREBY DECERTIFIED as to Count I. Only Counts III through VIII remain in this case. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 3/7/2019. (cib)
|
September 27, 2018 |
Filing
109
ORDER Granting Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Organized Crime, Uniform Land Sales Practices Act, and Breach Of Fiduciary Duty Counts In Class Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint For Damages, Declaratory, and Injunctive Relief, Filed April 30, 2018 re 90 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 9/27/2018. (cib, )
|
March 28, 2018 |
Filing
79
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DECERTIFY CLASS ACTION re 66 Motion ; re 71 Motion for Joinder. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 03/28/2018. Defendants' Motion to Decertify Class Acti on, filed August 15, 2017 is HEREBY DENIED. The Class has leave to file an amended complaint to add new class representatives for Count I. If Plaintiffs do not amend their complaint to add a class representative with standing to assert Count I, and who can affirmatively demonstrate compliance with the Rule 23(a) prerequisites, before May 1, 2018, Count I will be decertified. (eps, )
|
June 30, 2017 |
Filing
57
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER DENYINGPLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND re 42 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 06/30/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
36
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND 11 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 03/28/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|