Flores v. Trump
Plaintiff: Xavier Flores
Defendant: Donald Trump
Case Number: 1:2016cv00652
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re 10 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 03/02/2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to re ceive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 02/17/2017. Plaintiff's Complaint, which this Court previously dismissed without prejudice, is HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. In light of the di smissal of the Complaint with prejudice,Plaintiff's Application, and all of the other motions that Plaintiff filed with the Complaint, are HEREBY DENIED AS MOOT.This Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to close the case on March 10, 2017, u nless Plaintiff files a motion for reconsideration of this Order by March 6, 2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; RESERVING RULING ON PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS; AND RESERVING RULING ON ALL OTHER PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 01/12/2017. -- Plaintiff's Complaint, filed December 9, 2016, is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. This Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint by February 13, 2017. The amended complaint must comply with the terms of this Order.In light of the dismissal of the Complaint without prejudice, this Court RESERVES RULING on the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, and the other Motions that Plaintiff fi led on December 9, 2016, pending Plaintiff's filing of an amended complaint and this Court's screening of the amended complaint. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on January 13, 2017
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xavier Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?