Horowitz et al v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company et al
Plaintiff: Leonard G. Horowitz, Sherri Kane and Royal Bloodline of David
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company, First American Title Co. and Does 1 through 50
Case Number: 1:2016cv00666
Filed: December 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J. MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' RULE 60(B) MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM FINAL JUDGMENT [FRCP 60(B) (1)(2) AND (5)] re 115 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 4/15/2020. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Leonard G. Horowitz and Sherri Kane shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on April 16, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Objections and Affirming The Magistrate Judge's (1) Order Denying Plaintiffs Leonard G. Horowitz and Sherri Kane's Motion For Leave To File Proposed Second Amended Complaint For Damages and Other Relief [FRCP 15(A)(2)]; (2) Findings and Recommendation To Dismiss This Action With Prejudice re 95 ."On the basis of the foregoing, Plaintiff's objections to the magistrate judge's May 3, 2018 (1) Order Denying Plaintiffs Leonard G. Horowitz and Sherri Kanes Motion for Leave to File Proposed Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Other Relief [FRCP 15(a)(2)]; (2) Finding and Recommendation to Dismiss this Action with Prejudice, which Plaintiffs filed on May 14, 2018, are HEREB Y DENIED. The magistrate judges F&R is HEREBY ADOPTED in its entirety. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Proposed Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Other Relief [FRCP 15(a)(2)], filed February 26, 2018, is therefore DENIED. There being no operative pleading, the claims dismissed in the 6/30/17 Order without prejudice are HEREBY DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. There being no claims remaining in this case, this Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to enter final judgment and close the ca se." Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 12/21/2018. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART: (1) DEFENDANT FIRST AMERICAN TITLE CO.'S MOTION TO DISMISS "MOTION TO AMEND AS A MATTER OF COURSE [FRCP RULE 15(A)(1)(A)]; AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AGAINST ALL DEFENDANTS" [ECF NO 10 ] FILED ON JANUARY 4, 2017; AND (2) DEFENDANT STEWART TITLE GUARANTY CO.'S MOTION TO DISMISS MOTION TO AMEND AS A MATTER OF COURSE [FRCP RULE 15(A)(1)(A)]; AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, FILED JANUARY 4, 2017 [DKT. 10 ] re 36 Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 06/30/2017. Defendant First American Title Co.'s Motion to Dismiss "Motion to Amend as a Matter of Course [FRCP Rule 15(a)(1)(A)]; Amended Complaint for Damages Against all Defendants" [ECF No 10 ] Filed on January 4, 2017, filed January 17, 2017, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED insofar as all of the claims against First American are HEREBY DISMISSED. It is DENIED insofar as the dismis sal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Similarly, Defendant Stewart Title Guaranty Co.'s Motion to Dismiss Motion to Amend as a Matter of Course [FRCP Rule 15(a)(1)(A)]; Amended Complaint for Damages, Filed January 4, 2017 [Dkt. 10 ], filed January 20, 2017 , is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED insofar as all of the claims against Stewart Title are HEREBY DISMISSED. It is DENIED insofar as the dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. If Plaintiffs choose to file a second amended complaint , they must do so by July 31, 2017, and the second amended complaint must comply with the terms of this Order. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horowitz et al v. Stewart Title Guaranty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard G. Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Bloodline of David
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Title Guaranty Company
Represented By: Jade L. Ching
Represented By: Jenny Nakamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Co.
Represented By: Michael C. Bird
Represented By: Summer H. Kaiawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?