Robert Naehu, Jr. v. Thomas Read
Plaintiff: |
Robert Naehu, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Thomas Read and John Does 1-10 |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv00673 |
Filed: |
December 23, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
DERRICK K. WATSON |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
31
AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT FROM WHICH IT WAS REMOVED re 11 , 19 , 29 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/28/2017. "For the foregoing reasons, the Court ADOPTS the Findings and Recommendation to Grant Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Case To State Court From Which It Was Removed and OVERRULES Defendant Reads Objections." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Participants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
March 23, 2017 |
Filing
29
ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION TO GRANT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT FROM WHICH IT WAS REMOVED re 19 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 3/23/2017. "For the foregoing reasons, the Court ADOP TS the Findings and Recommendation to Grant Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Case To State Court From Which It Was Removed and OVERRULES Defendant Read's Objections." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEPar ticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?