Hester v. Horowitz
Plaintiff: |
Jason Hester |
Defendant: |
Leonard G. Horowitz |
Intervenor_plaintiff: |
Sherri Kane |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00014 |
Filed: |
January 11, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Hawaii |
Presiding Judge: |
KEVIN S.C. CHANG |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI |
Nature of Suit: |
All Other Real Property |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 28, 2017 |
Filing
29
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO RECONSIDER AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 04/28/2017. -- Defendants M otion to Reconsider Amended Order Adopting Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations, filed March 3, 2017, is HEREBY DENIED. This Court DIRECTS the Clerks Office to effectuate the remand of this case immediately (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing
21
AMENDED ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 re 15 Findings and Recommendations. re 18 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 02/17/2017. Defendant's Motio n for Declaratory Judgment as Alternative to Remand, filed February 10, 2017 which this Court CONSTRUES as his objections to the magistrate judge's January 27, 2017 Findings and Recommendation to Remand Action to State Court is HEREBY DENIED. This Court HEREBY ADOPTS the magistrate judge's findings and recommendation as the opinion and order of this Court.This Court DIRECTS the Clerk's Office to effectuate the remand of this case on March 10, 2017, unless a motion for reconsi deration of this Order is filed by March 6, 2017. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
February 15, 2017 |
Filing
19
ORDER ADOPTING MAGISTRATE JUDGES FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 02/15/2017. "Findings and Recommendation To Remand Action To State Court" filed on January 27, 2017, ECF NO. 15 (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?