Gatewood v. Harrington et al
Plaintiff: |
John Leon Gatewood |
Defendant: |
Scott Harrington, April McNeil and Tui Faatea |
Case Number: |
1:2017cv00090 |
Filed: |
March 2, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI |
Presiding Judge: |
KENNETH J. MANSFIELD |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 29, 2018 |
Filing
168
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT APRIL MCNEIL'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re: 122 . Excerpt of conclusion:"The Motion is GRANTED as to the portion of Plaintiff's retaliat ion claim based on his placement in solitary confinement and his misconduct hearing. The Motion is DENIED as to the portion of Plaintiff's retaliation claim based on McNeil's alleged falsification of the incident report dated September 25, 2015." Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/29/2018. (afc)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants will be served on November 30, 2018 by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
|
April 11, 2017 |
Filing
6
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT IN PART AND DENYING ASSISTANCE OF COUNSEL re 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by John Leon Gatewood. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 04/11/2017. (1) The Complaint is DISMISSED IN PART for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 1915(e)(2) and 1915A(b)(1). Specifically, Gatewood states a retaliation claim against ACOs Tui Faatea and April McNeil and these claims shall proceed and be answered after service is pe rfected. (2) Gatewood may file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies in his dismissed claims on or before April 25, 2017.(3) In the alternative, Gatewood may NOTIFY the Court in writing on or before April 25, 2017, that he elects to s tand on his retaliation claims against Defendants April McNeil and Tui Faatea. If Gatewood chooses this option, the Court will order the U.S. Marshal to serve the Complaint at Gatewood's direction as to those claims.(4) The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Gatewood a prisoner civil rights complaint form so that he can comply with the directions in this Order. (eps, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications served by first class mail on April 12, 2017.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?