Kapu v. Attorney General, State of Hawaii et al
Plaintiff: Mo'i Kapu
Defendant: Attorney General, State of Hawaii, Hawai'i, State of and Bureau of Conveyances, State of Hawaii
Case Number: 1:2017cv00213
Filed: May 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L. PUGLISI
Presiding Judge: DERRICK K. WATSON
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL re 15 , 18 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/16/2017. "Accordingly, the Court revokes Appellants IFP status." (emt, )CERTIF ICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Mo'i Kapu shall be served by first class mail to the address of record on November 17, 2017. The Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals served electronically re 9CCA No. 17-17310. Modified on 11/16/2017 (emt, ).
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (1) DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE; (2) DENYING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY AND/OR PERMANENT INJUNCTION; (3) DENYING MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RECEIVER; AND (4) DISMISSING CASE re 11 , 12 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 10/6/2017. " Based upon the foregoing, the Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without further leave to amend. All pending Motions are DENIED. The clerk of court is directed to close the case." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Moi Kapu served by first class mail at the address of record on October 6, 2017.
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re 7 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 8/2/2017. "Based upon the foregoing, the First Amended Complaint is DISMISSED with limited leave to amend. Mo'i Kap u is once more granted limited leave to file an amended complaint in accordance with the terms of this order by no later than September 1, 2017. The Court CAUTIONS Mo'i Kapu that failure to file an amended complaint by September 1, 201 7 will result in the automatic dismissal of this action without prejudice." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Mo'i Kapu served by first class mail to the address of record on August 2, 2017.
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (1) GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FEES OR COSTS; AND (2) DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re 2 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/15/2017. "Based upon the foregoing, the Complaint is DISMISS ED with limited leave to amend, and the IFP Application is GRANTED. Mo'i Kapu is granted limited leave to file an amended complaint in accordance with the terms of this order by no later than June 9, 2017. The Court CAUTIONS Mo&# 039;i Kapu that failure to file an amended complaint by June 9, 2017 will result in the automatic dismissal of this action without prejudice." (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Mo'i Kapu served by first class mail at the address of record on May 15, 2017.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kapu v. Attorney General, State of Hawaii et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mo'i Kapu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General, State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawai'i, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Conveyances, State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?