May 28, 2019 |
Filing
196
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS HUNT, WAKITA, TINGLE, TAVARES, AND ISHII'S MOTION FOR TERMINATING SANCTIONS, ECF NO. 182 Based on the foregoing, Defendants' Motion for Terminating Sanctions is DENIED. Th e parties are ORDERED to confer in good faith by June 21, 2019, to attempt to work out a schedule for Plaintiff to pay the $787.50 sanction. Any agreed upon payment schedule must be reduced to writing, signed by Plaintiff and Defendants' co unsel, and filed (by Defendants' counsel) with the court by June 28, 2019. If an agreement as to a payment schedule is not reached and Plaintiff claims that she is unable to pay all or any portion of the sanction, she must file documentation wit h the court in support of her claimed inability to pay by June 28, 2019. The parties shall attend a Status Conference on July 12, 2019, at 9:00 a.m., before Magistrate Judge Rom Trader to provide an update concerning this matter. Both parties may ap pear by telephone. Plaintiff is again warned that the court may dismiss her action sua sponte should she fail to comply with this Order and/or the federal and local rules. See Hells Canyon Preservation Council v. U.S. Forest Serv., 403 F.3d 683, 689 (9th Cir. 2005). IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/28/2019 (jo)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
|
April 2, 2019 |
Filing
190
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT LORI HENBEST'S MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION, ECF NO. 147 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/2/2019. (jo)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
|
March 18, 2019 |
Filing
181
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISQUALIFY MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S. C. CHANG, ECF NO. 142 "In sum, Plaintiff has failed to establish bias and therefore, disqualification pursuant to § 144 is not warranted. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Kevin S. C. Chang, ECF No. 142 is DENIED." Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/18/2019 (jo)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
|
February 13, 2018 |
Filing
66
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS HUNT, WAKITA, TINGLE, TAVARES, AND ISHII'S MOTION TO DISMISS, ECF NO. 37 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/13/2018. (afc) WRITTEN ORDER follows hearing held January 22, 2018. Minutes of h earing: ECF 53 . CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
August 4, 2017 |
Filing
16
ORDER: (1) DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 14 ; AND (2) DIRECTING SERVICE OF THE ORIGINAL COMPLAINT 1 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/4/2017. (afc) Excerpt of conclusion:"[T]he FAC [First Amended Complaint] is DISMISSED without leave to amend for failure to state a claim.""Plaintiff is notified that, until service of the original Complaint has been effected, Plaintiff should not file motions or other documen ts with the court. Plaintiff is further notified that she must comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules for the District of Hawaii."CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to re ceive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications will be served by first class mail on August 7, 2017.
|
July 11, 2017 |
Filing
11
ORDER: (1) GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS 4 ; (2) DISMISSING COMPLAINT IN PART; AND (3) DENYING REQUEST FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION 9 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/11/2017. (afc) Excerpt of conclusion: "Plaintiff's IFP Application is GRANTED. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B), Plaintiff's conspiracy claim is DISMISSED with leave to amend for failure to state a claim, and all claims against Freitas are DISMISSED without leave to amend for failure to state a claim. By August 4, 2017, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint as set forth above. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by August 4, 2 017, the Complaint will remain the operative pleading and the court will issue an order directing service." STAFF NOTATION re: State of Hawaii Judge Harry P. Freitas: F ootnote no. 1 on page numbered 2 states: "Although the Complaint's caption did not name Judge Freitas, the court includes him as a Defendant because it is clear from the body of the Complaint that Plaintiff is asserting claims against Judge Freitas." CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications will be served by first class mail on July 12, 2017.
|