Thompson v. Capt. Paleka, et al
Plaintiff: Thad Thompson
Defendant: Capt. Paleka, Maintenance Supervisor, Medical Supervisor, Chief Antonio, Warden Harrington and Shari Kimoto
Case Number: 1:2017cv00531
Filed: October 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J. MANSFIELD
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 DISMISSAL ORDER."Plaintiff has not submitted the $400 civil filing fee and this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and terminate this action." Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MO LLWAY on 2/6/18. (cib, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ORDER DENYING RENEWED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING PAYMENT re: 2 , 6 . Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/5/2018. (afc) The Order Denying Renewed In Forma Pauperis Application and Directing Payment filed on January 4, 2018, is amended to correct formatting anomalies that somehow appeared when the word processing form of theOrder was converted to a PDF. The content of the order is unchanged.CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying Renewed In Forma Pauperis Application And Directing Payment. "Plaintiff has accrued three strikes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), and fails to allege plausible facts to support an imminent danger of serious physical injury, his In Forma Pauperis Application, ECF No. 2, remains DENIED. Plaintiff may proceed with this action if he submits the $400 filing fee to the Clerk of Court within twenty one 21 days of the date of this Order, or on or before January 2 5, 2018. If Plaintiff fails to submit the civil filing fee on or before January 25, 2018, this action will be automatically terminated without further notice without prejudice to refiling with concurrent payment of the filing fee." Signed by JUD GE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 1/4/18. (cib, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING IN FORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION AND DISMISSING COMPLAINT. "Thompsons IFP Application is DENIED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g).Thompsons Complaint is DISMISSED with leave granted toamend pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §§ 19 15(e)(2) and 1915A(b). Because Thompson has accrued three strikes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g), and because he fails to allege sufficient facts to support an imminent danger of serious physical injury, his in forma pauperis application is DEN IED. Failure to pay the civil filing fee OR file an amended pleading that plausibly alleges imminent danger of serious physical injury AND cures the original Complaints noted deficiencies on or before December 13, 2017, shall result in DISMISSAL of t his action and may constitute a strike under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g)." Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 11/13/17. (cib, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications rec eived this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. Copy of order, instruction for filing a prisoner civil right complaint mailed to Pro Se Plaintiff Thad Thompson
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Capt. Paleka, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thad Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. Paleka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maintenance Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Antonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shari Kimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?