Rigsbee v. Honolulu, City & County of
Plaintiff: Clifford McArthur Rigsbee
Defendant: Honolulu, City and County of
Case Number: 1:2017cv00532
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J. MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 REGARDING SUBSEQUENT REMEDIAL MEASURES (ECF NO. 143 ) re 177 - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 3/7/2019. (emt, )
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE UNFOUNDED ECONOMIC OPINIONS (ECF NO. 131 ) re 177 - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 3/6/2019. Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Unfounded Economic Opinions is < B>GRANTED. Defendant's expert Jack C. Suyderhoud, Ph.D. is permitted to testify at trial. Dr. Suyderhoud's opinions must conform to the Court's October 16, 2018 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISPOS ITIVE RULINGS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 16 AND 56(a) REGARDING THE AVAILABILITY OF HEDONIC DAMAGES AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISPOSITIVE RULINGS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 16 AND 56(a) REGARDING THE ESTATE'S SURVIVAL-CLAIM FOR FUTURE LO ST EARNINGS. (ECF No. 99). Dr. Suyderhoud may not provide legal opinions. He also may not rely on Hawaii Revised Statutes §§ 663-7 and 663-8 for his opinion. Specifically, he may not testify that Plaintiff's loss of future ea rnings damages should be reduced pursuant to Hawaii state law. Dr. Suyderhoud is precluded from testifying that pre-judgment interest is not available in this case. The Court rules that the remedy of pre-judgment interest is available in this case. (emt, )
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT CITY AND COUNTY OF HONOLULU'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER (ECF NO. 129 ) re 151 - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 2/28/2019. (emt, )
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISPOSITIVE RULINGS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 16 AND 56(A) REGARDING THE AVAILABILITY OF HEDONIC DAMAGES (ECF No. 48 ) AND GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DISPOSITIVE RULINGS UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 16 AND 56(a) REGARDING THE ESTATE'S SURVIVAL-CLAIM FOR FUTURE LOST EARNINGS (ECF No. 50 ) - Signed by JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR on 10/16/2018. (emt, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rigsbee v. Honolulu, City & County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford McArthur Rigsbee
Represented By: David L. Fairbanks
Represented By: John R. Hillsman
Represented By: Howard G. McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honolulu, City and County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?