Aubart v. Esper
Plaintiff: Kevin T. Aubart
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Case Number: 1:2017cv00611
Filed: December 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: UNASSIGNED
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J. MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion For Summary Judgment re 73 .On the basis of the foregoing, Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, filed June 18, 2019, is HEREBY GRANTED as to Plaintiff's TDY Claim. There being no other claims r emaining in this case, the Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to enter final judgment in favor of Defendant and close the case immediately. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/19/2019. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment re 57 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 6/28/2019. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendant's Motion To Dismiss re 37 ."On the basis of the foregoing, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, filed October 1, 2018, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Motion is GRANTED insofar as Plaintiff's FTCA claim is DISMISSED, and DENIED insofar as the dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Motion is also DENIED as to Plaintiff's TDY Travel claim.Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file a second amended complaint by February 13, 2019. This Court CAUTIONS Plaintiff that, if he fails to file his second amended complaint by February 13, 2019, his FTCA claim will be dismissed with prejudice, and the case will proceed only as to Plaintiff's TDY Travel claim. This Court also CAUTIONS Plaintiff that, if the second amended complaint fails to cure the defects in his FTCA claim that are identified in this Order, the claim may be dismissed with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED." Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 1/17/2019. (cib)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 9 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 8/30/2018. On the basis of the foregoing, Defendants Motion to Dismis s, or in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment, filed March 13, 2018, is HEREBY GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Defendant's Motion is GRANTED insofar as the Complaint is DISMISSED. Defendant's Motion is DENIED insofar as the dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE and the motion for summary judgment is not reached. Plaintiff must file his amended complaint, consistent with the terms of this Order, by no later than September 28, 2018. (emt, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aubart v. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin T. Aubart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark T. Esper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?