D'Agirbaud v. Alanzo et al
Plaintiff: |
Quintin-John D'Agirbaud, III |
Defendant: |
Sarah Alanzo, Dovie Borges, Nolan Espinda, Scott Harrington, Shari Kimoto, Teresa Miike, Thomas Evans and Sean Ornellas |
Case Number: |
1:2018cv00021 |
Filed: |
January 12, 2018 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii |
Office: |
Hawaii Office |
County: |
Honolulu |
Presiding Judge: |
RICHARD L. PUGLISI |
Presiding Judge: |
J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 16, 2019 |
Filing
69
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDERS, ECF NO. 65 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/16/2019. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
|
March 19, 2018 |
Filing
15
ORDER DENYING MOTIONS FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re: 9 . Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/19/2018. (afc)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry
|
February 27, 2018 |
Filing
7
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT IN PART re: 1 . Excerpt of conclusion:"Claims in Counts I and II as alleged under the Eighth Amendment state plausible claims for relief against Defendants Sarah Alanzo and Do vie Borges in their individual capacities, and may proceed.... Claims against all Defendants in their official capacities, claims asserted against all Defendants under the Fourth Amendment in Count IV, and under the Fourteenth Amendment in Count VI are DISMISSED with prejudice.All other claims as asserted against all Defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended pleading that cures the noted deficiencies in any claims that have been dismissed without prejudi ce on or before March 28, 2018.IN THE ALTERNATIVE, Plaintiff may notify the court in writing on or before March 28, 2018, that he elects to proceed with his claims against Defendants Sarah Alanzo and Dovie Borges as limited in this Order, and tho se claims shall be served." IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/26/2018. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notif ications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). A copy of the instant Order and the "COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS" (Prisoner Complaint, Form name: Pro Se 14) has been served this date by first class mail upon Quintin-John D'Agirbaud, III at his address of record.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?