Tylor v. Kauai All Islands Real Estate Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Defendant: James G. Pycha, Kauai All Islands Real Estate Services LLC, Doe Associations 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00116
Filed: March 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Kauai
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. Kauai All Islands Real Estate Services LLC, James G. Pycha. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Services)(Anderson, Dane)
May 14, 2018 Filing 10 EO: At Plaintiff's request to allow sufficient time for parties to answer, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/04/2018 IS CONTINUED TO 06/14/2018 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 06/07/2018. Counsel Dane K. Anderson to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 30, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Clerk: Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Copyright (form AO 121), filed as ECF #8 , transmitted this date by first class mail addressed to the Register of Copyrights. (afc)
April 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Vincent Khoury Tylor (AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright) Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Anderson, Dane)
March 27, 2018 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Register of Copyrights. (emt, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/4/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
March 27, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kauai All Islands Real Estate Services LLC, James G. Pycha. (emt, )
March 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00116 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
March 23, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Street, J.)
March 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENTS AND DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2008296.), filed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B (part 1 of 4), #3 Exhibit B (part 2 of 4), #4 Exhibit B (part 3 of 4), #5 Exhibit B (part 4 of 4), #6 Exhibit C (part 1 of 2), #7 Exhibit C (part 1 of 2))(Street, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tylor v. Kauai All Islands Real Estate Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Pycha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kauai All Islands Real Estate Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Represented By: J. Stephen Street
Represented By: Dane K. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?