Tylor v. Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10, Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc., Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00237
Filed: June 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Filing 17 Defendant Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc. dba Honolulu Jewelry Company's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hu, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Hu on behalf of Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc. on behalf of Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hu, Jeffrey)
July 31, 2018 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hu, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION (1) TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER FILED ON JULY 10, 2018 [Dkt. No. #10 ]; (2) TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER [Dkt. No. #10 ] BY DEFENDANT, FILED ON JULY 23, 2018 [Dkt. No. #11 ]; AND (3) FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER re #11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 7/30/2018. Motion terminated: #11 MOTION to Strike Answer [Dkt. 10] By Defendant JOHNSON-PACIFIC ENTERPRISES, INC., a Hawaii Corporation, dba HONOLULU JEWELRY COMPANY filed by Vincent Khoury Tylor.; Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc. answer due 8/9/2018. (emt, )
July 26, 2018 ADVISORY ENTRY. Re: The entry docket number #13 Notice of Appearance filed by Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc. ~ Please be advised that the Notice of Appearance reflects the appearance of Randall Y. Yamamoto, Esq. and Jeffrey Hu, Esq. and is e-filed by Randall Y. Yamamoto. It is recommended that, in order for each attorney to associate themselves to the case, individual Notices of Appearance be filed, using the CM/ECF login of the specific attorney. (emt, )
July 26, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Randall Y. Yamamoto on behalf of Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc. on behalf of Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Yamamoto, Randall)
July 24, 2018 Filing 12 EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d), the Court elects to decide #11 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Answer without a hearing and directs briefing as follows: any opposition shall be filed by 8/7/2018; reply shall be filed by 8/21/2018.The Court also CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2018 to 10/25/2018 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. Scheduling Conference Statements shall be filed no later than 10/18/2018. Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the date set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
July 23, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike Answer [Dkt. 10] By Defendant JOHNSON-PACIFIC ENTERPRISES, INC., a Hawaii Corporation, dba HONOLULU JEWELRY COMPANY Dane K. Anderson appearing for Plaintiff Vincent Khoury Tylor (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Certificate of Service)(Anderson, Dane)
July 10, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - by David Johnson, on behalf of Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc. (emt, )
July 5, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Complaint and #8 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright has been served by First Class Mail to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, DC 20559 on July 5, 2018. (emt, )
June 22, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc. served on 6/22/2018. (emt, )
June 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by Vincent Khoury Tylor (AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright) Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Anderson, Dane)
June 19, 2018 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk will transmit the AO 121 Report to the U.S. Copyright Office. (emt, )
June 19, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/14/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
June 19, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc. (emt, )
June 19, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00237 DKW-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
June 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Street, J.)
June 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENTS AND DIGITAL MILLENNIUM COPYRIGHT ACT VIOLATIONS against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2048365.), filed by Vincent Khoury Tylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C (part 1 of 2), #4 Exhibit C (part 2 of 2))(Street, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tylor v. Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Associations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson-Pacific Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Hu
Represented By: Randall Y. Yamamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Khoury Tylor
Represented By: Dane K. Anderson
Represented By: J. Stephen Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?