Krizek v. Queens Medical Center et al

Plaintiff: Helena Krizek
Defendant: Dr. Ittikorn Spanuchart, Hawaii Coroner, Hawaii Residency Program (HRP), Dr. Nobuhiro Ariyoshi, Dr. Hao Chih Ho, Dr. Christopher Happy, Dr. Matthew Dumouchel, Dr. T. Scott Gallacher, Dr. Wendy W Hsu and Queens Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2018cv00293
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Outside state of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT DR. CHRISTOPHER HAPPY re #22 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 9/28/2018. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Helena Krizek served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 28, 2018. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
September 27, 2018 Filing 25 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Nobuhiro Ariyoshi, Hawaii Residency Program (HRP), Ittikorn Spanuchart. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bordner, William)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 9/27/2018. Pursuant to LR 16.5(b), all parties and their lead counsel are hereby ORDERED TO APPEAR before the undersigned on April 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m., Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Helena Krizek served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 27, 2018. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 9/27/2018. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Helena Krizek served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 27, 2018. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF).
September 27, 2018 Filing 21 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 9/27/2018. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to be issued. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 7/7/2020 before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/26/2020 at 09:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference is set for 4/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Settlement Conference statements by 4/14/2020. Dispositive Motions filed by 2/5/2020. Discovery due by 5/8/2020. (Court Reporter In chambers - not reported) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
September 26, 2018 Filing 22 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendant Dr. Christopher Happy - by Plaintiff Helena Krizek. (Attachments: #1 USPS Tracking Information, #2 Complaint, 18-CV-6481, USDC Southern District of New York, #3 Mailing Documentation) (emt, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 20 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by T. Scott Gallacher, Hao Chih Ho, Wendy W Hsu, Queens Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Edquon)
September 26, 2018 Filing 19 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Matthew Dumouchel. (Nishimoto, Trisha)
September 20, 2018 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement OF DEFENDANT MATTHEW C. DUMOUCHEL, M.D.. (Nishimoto, Trisha)
September 20, 2018 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bordner, William)
September 20, 2018 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Edquon)
September 7, 2018 Filing 15 Scheduling Conference Statement and Certificate of Service by Helena Krizek, (Birth Mother of Bianca Helen Krizek (Decedent). (apg, dist)
August 16, 2018 Filing 14 DEFENDANT MATTHEW C. DUMOUCHEL, M.D.'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Matthew Dumouchel. (Attachments: #1 JURY DEMAND, #2 Certificate of Service)(Nishimoto, Trisha)
August 13, 2018 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawaii Residency Program (HRP). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bordner, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 12 Defendants Hawaii Residency Programs, Inc.'s, Nobuhiro Ariyoshi, M.D.'s, and Ittikorn Spanuchart, M.D.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Nobuhiro Ariyoshi, Hawaii Residency Program (HRP), Ittikorn Spanuchart. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bordner, William)
August 13, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Queens Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Edquon)
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by T. Scott Gallacher, Hao Chih Ho, Wendy W Hsu, Queens Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lee, Edquon)
August 2, 2018 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/27/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/2/2018. (emt, ) (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Helena Krizek served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 2, 2018.
August 2, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES: The Clerk of Court for the U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii gives notice its receipt of the electronic case record for Civil Case 1:18-cv-06481 PGG; Krizek v. Queens Medical Center; et al., transferred from the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York. Please be advised that this case has been assigned to Chief U.S. District Judge J. Michael Seabright and U.S. Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. Accordingly, please reflect case number CV 18-00293 JMS-RLP on all further filings. The Local Rules of Practice for the U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii and other Court Resources are available on the Court's website at www.hid.uscourts.gov. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Helena Krizek served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 2, 2018. A copy of the Court's Pro Se Handbook shall be included in the mailing to Ms. Krizek.
August 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00293 JMS-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Helena Krizek served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 2, 2018.
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-06481. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 26, 2018 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of Hawaii (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Mailed a copy of #4 Order by Certified Mail # 7002 2410 0005 1439 6587 to Helena Krizek 244 West 64th Street #6H New York, NY 10023 with Return Receipt Requested. (rro) Modified on 7/31/2018 (rro). [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re: #4 Order to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii, and to close this case. The Clerk of Court is further directed to mail a copy of this order by certified mail to Plaintiff, and to note mailing on the docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 7/25/2018) (cf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Hawaii Residency Program (HRP), Dr. Ittikorn Spanuchart. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dr. Nobuhiro Ariyoshi, Hawaii Residency Program (HRP). (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Queens Medical Center. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dr. Matthew Dumouchel. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dr. Wendy W Hsu. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dr. Hao Chih Ho. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dr. Christopher Happy. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dr. T. Scott Gallacher. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nobuhiro Ariyoshi, Hawaii Coroner, Christopher Happy, Matthew Dumouchel, T. Scott Gallacher, Hao Chih Ho, Christopher Happy, Hawaii Residency Program (HRP), Hao Chih Ho, Wendy W Hsu, Ittikorn Spanuchart, Matthew Dumochel, Nobuhiro Ariyoshi, Queens Medical Center, Ittikorn Spanuchart, T. Scott Gallacher, Wendy W Hsu. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401214065)Document filed by Helena Krizek.(pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 8/2/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krizek v. Queens Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Ittikorn Spanuchart
Represented By: William A. Bordner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Coroner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Residency Program (HRP)
Represented By: William A. Bordner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Nobuhiro Ariyoshi
Represented By: William A. Bordner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hao Chih Ho
Represented By: Edquon Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Christopher Happy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Matthew Dumouchel
Represented By: Trisha L Nishimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. T. Scott Gallacher
Represented By: Edquon Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Wendy W Hsu
Represented By: Edquon Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queens Medical Center
Represented By: Edquon Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helena Krizek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?