Lau et al v. Honolulu Park Place, AOAO, et al.
Plaintiff: Garrick Lau, Wilson Lau and Mabel Lau
Defendant: Richard Baldwin, Rebecca Friedman, Honolulu Park Place, AOAO, Trappeur Rahn, Kelly Brehm, Christine Trecker, Craig Williams, Melanie King, Tom Heiden, Walter Miranda, Katherine Crosier, Dennis Padlock and Garry Belen
Case Number: 1:2018cv00295
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/1/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 11/6/2018 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 10/30/18. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Major, David)
September 22, 2018 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Phillips, Lunsford)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 REPORT of Planning Meeting By Plaintiiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Phillips, Lunsford)
September 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing on #6 Defendants Honolulu Park Place, AOAO, Craig Williams, Rebecca Friedman, Richard Baldwin, Melanie King, Katherine Crosier, Trappeur Rahn, Christine Trecker, Dennis Padlock, Kelly Brehm, Tom Heiden, Garry Belen and Walter Miranda's Motion To Dismiss Complaint Filed August 2, 2018 is set for 10/26/2018 at 09:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. (tyk)
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to State a Claim David R. Major appearing for Defendants Christine Trecker, Richard Baldwin, Kelly Brehm, Tom Heiden, Rebecca Friedman, Walter Miranda, Katherine Crosier, Dennis Padlock, Melanie King, Honolulu Park Place, AOAO, Garry Belen, Trappeur Rahn, Craig Williams (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of David R. Major, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Certificate of Service)(Major, David)
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/1/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/2/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(emt, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00295 DKW-KSC on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2069144.), filed by Garrick Lau. (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand, #2 Summons)(Phillips, Lunsford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lau et al v. Honolulu Park Place, AOAO, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Baldwin
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Friedman
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honolulu Park Place, AOAO
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trappeur Rahn
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Brehm
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Trecker
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig Williams
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie King
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Heiden
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Miranda
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Crosier
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Padlock
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry Belen
Represented By: David R. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garrick Lau
Represented By: Lunsford D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilson Lau
Represented By: Lunsford D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mabel Lau
Represented By: Lunsford D. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?