Landmark Technology LLC v. Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd.

Plaintiff: Landmark Technology LLC
Defendant: Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00307
Filed: August 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: ALAN C KAY
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Filing 22 EO: Pursuant to Tom Bush's request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conferenceset for 10/15/18 @ 9:00 AM is continued to 11/30/2018 @ 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference statements to be filed by 11/23/18. John Lee may appear by telephone. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
October 1, 2018 Filing 21 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lee, John)
September 29, 2018 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tam-Sugiyama, Joyce)
September 29, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Landmark Technology LLC by Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim, #2 Certificate of Service)(Tam-Sugiyama, Joyce)
September 17, 2018 Filing 18 EO: John Lee may appear by telephone at the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/18 @ 9:00 a.m. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT HAWAIIAN ISLES KONA COFFEE CO., LTD. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT; SUMMONS [DOC #1 ] FILED AUGUST 8, 2018 AND ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 9/14/2018. Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd. answer due 9/28/2018. (emt, )
September 13, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Joyce W. Y. Tam-Sugiyama on behalf of Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd. on behalf of Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tam-Sugiyama, Joyce)
August 15, 2018 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed 8/14/18 Acknowledgement filed by Landmark Technology LLC. (Bush, Thomas)
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Landmark Technology LLC. Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd.. (Bush, Thomas)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING THE APPLICATION OF JOHN A. LEE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE re: #5 . Signed by U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/14/2018. (afc) JOHN A. LEE, ESQ. (Law firm: Banie & Ishimoto LLP) added as attorney pro hac vice for plaintiff LANDMARK TECHNOLOGY LLC
August 8, 2018 Filing 11 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet: (Attachments: NOTICE to Parties regarding service pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and: #1 AO 398 form: Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 form: Waiver of the Service of Summons) (afc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd. (afc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 9 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/15/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/8/2018. (afc) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Case Assignment to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE ALAN C. KAY and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00307-ACK-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)
August 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE by Landmark Technology LLC Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark Landmark Technology LLC. (Bush, Thomas)
August 8, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2072000.Thomas E. Bush appearing for Plaintiff Landmark Technology LLC (Bush, Thomas)
August 8, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Landmark Technology LLC. (Bush, Thomas)
August 8, 2018 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Bush, Thomas)
August 8, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Bush, Thomas)
August 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2071957.), filed by Landmark Technology LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bush, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landmark Technology LLC v. Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landmark Technology LLC
Represented By: Thomas E. Bush
Represented By: John A. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Isles Kona Coffee Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Joyce W. Y. Tam-Sugiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?