Newman v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Steven Newman
Defendant: Roe "Non Profit" Corporations 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Robert Duong, United States of America, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2018cv00308
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 22, 2018 10 Featured Case STIPULATION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT WITHOUT PREJUDICE; ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/21/2018. (afc)
August 14, 2018 9 WRIT of Certiorari to The Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii - issued. (afc)
August 14, 2018 8 Featured Case ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF CERTIORARI. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 8/14/2018. (afc)
August 13, 2018 7 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS; Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate - received from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii. Transmission of those documents filed in the State Court Civil case 18-1-0552-04 BIA. (Attachments: #1 Computerized Index, #2 Civil Information Sheet, #3 Complaint; Jury Demand; Summons, #4 Request to Exempt Case from the Court Annexed Arbitration Program; Exhibit 1, #5 Arbitration Administrator's Decision Granting Request, #6 Return and Acknowledgment of Service, #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (afc)
August 9, 2018 6 Featured Case SUBSTITUTION OF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR DEFENDANT ROBERT DUONG PURSUANT TO FRCP RULE 17(a)(2); ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/9/2018. (afc) United States of America substituted as defendant; Party defendant Robert Duong terminated.
August 9, 2018 5 APPLICATION for Writ of Certiorari Ordering the Circuit Court Records from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii ; COS by Robert Duong. (Ching, Edric)
August 9, 2018 4 CLERK OF COURT'S MEMORANDUM re: Corporate Disclosure Statements. (afc)
August 9, 2018 3 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/10/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Signed by CHIEF U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/9/2018. (afc)
August 9, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment to CHIEF U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00308-JMS-KSC on all further pleadings. (afc)
August 9, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Robert Duong ; COS. Removal from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 18-1-0552-04 BIA., filed by Robert Duong. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Thomas A. Helper, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Exhibit "B")(Ching, Edric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newman v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe "Non Profit" Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Duong
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Edric Ming-Kai Ching
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Newman
Represented By: Don V. Huynh
Represented By: Rechelle A.M. Barbour
Represented By: Laurent J. Remillard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?