Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds, et al. v. Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc.

Plaintiff: Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund, Annuity Fund, Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET), Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Pension Fund, Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds and Health & Welfare Fund
Defendant: Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00309
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
0 Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
1 Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 2, 2018 15 MOTION Ex Parte Motion for Issuance of Garnishee Summons After Judgment Ashley K Ikeda appearing for Plaintiff Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 [Proposed] Order, #3 [Proposed] Garnishee Summons, #4 Exhibit A)(Ikeda, Ashley)
September 11, 2018 14 EO: In light of the #13 Clerk's Default Judgment, the #10 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment by Clerk Against Defendant Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc. set for 10/16/2018 is VACATED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 11, 2018 13 CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT against Defendant Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc. (cib, )
September 10, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a copy of the 12 EO setting hearing and briefing schedule re #10 Motion for Default Judgment will be served by First Class Mail on 09/11/2018 to Defendant at:Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc.96-1276 Waihona St., Unit 106Pearl City, HI 96782-1972See ECF No. 10-5. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (mansfield2, chmb)
September 10, 2018 12 EO: The hearing on Plaintiffs' #10 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment by Clerk Against Defendant Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc. ("Motion") is set for 10/16/2018, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 6 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Defendant shall file an opposition to the Motion by 09/25/2018. Plaintiffs may file a reply by 10/03/2018.(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (mansfield2)
September 7, 2018 11 EO: In light of the #8 Entry of Default, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/15/2018 is VACATED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 6, 2018 10 Request for Entry of Default Judgment By Clerk Against Defendant Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc., a Hawaii corporation Ashley K Ikeda appearing for Plaintiff Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Declaration of Troy Tonini, #3 Statement of Amounts Due, #4 [Proposed] Default Judgment, #5 Certificate of Service)(Ikeda, Ashley)
September 6, 2018 9 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc. (cib, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2018: #1 Exhibit A) (cib, ).
September 5, 2018 8 REQUEST Entry of Default by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley K. Ikeda, #2 Exhibit A, #3 [Proposed] Entry of Default)(Ikeda, Ashley)
August 20, 2018 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. All Defendants. (Ikeda, Ashley)
August 9, 2018 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib, )
August 9, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc. (cib, )
August 9, 2018 4 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 10/15/2018 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/9/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, ) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
August 9, 2018 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00309-LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib, )
August 9, 2018 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Ikeda, Ashley)
August 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Specific Performance, Assumpsit and Damages against Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2072902.), filed by Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 [Proposed] Summons)(Ikeda, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds, et al. v. Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vacation & Holiday Trust Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annuity Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' and Employers' Cooperation and Education Trust Fund (LECET)
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Hawaii Laborers' Trust Funds
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Jerry P.S. Chang
Represented By: Ashley K Ikeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Landscape Maintenance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?