Provolt vs. Crane Company

Plaintiff: Gary E. Provolt
Defendant: Does 1 to 25 and Crane Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00313
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
0 Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
1 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2018 10 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS; Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate - received from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii. Transmission of those documents filed in the State Court Civil Case 18-1-1103-07 JHA. (Attachments: #1 Computerized Index, #2 Complaint; Summons, #3 Request and Order to Exempt Case From The Court Annexed Arbitration Program; Summary of Facts, #4 Declaration of Service; Exhibits "A", #5 Defendant Crane CO.'s Notice Of Filing Notice of Removal) (cib, )
August 21, 2018 9 EO: The Court CONTINUES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/12/2018 to 12/18/2018 at 9:30 a.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)
August 21, 2018 8 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction : Motion Hearing is set for 11/26/2018 at 09:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )
August 20, 2018 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction William M. Harstad appearing for Defendant Crane Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint filed July 13, 2018, #4 Exhibit B - Edgar Online filing confirmation page and cover sheet to Crane Co.'s 2018 Form 10-K annual report, #5 Exhibit C - Complaint for Personal Injury filed March 9, 2018, #6 Exhibit D - Party List information for Provolt v. Air & Liquid Systems Corp. et al. from Hoohiki, #7 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)
August 13, 2018 6 Additional Exhibits to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D3 Report and Declaration of S. Foreman, #2 Exhibit E State Court Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #3 Demand for Jury Trial, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(Tam-Sugiyama, Joyce)
August 13, 2018 5 Additional Exhibits to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C4 Affidavit of D. Sargent, #2 Exhibit D Report and Declaration of S. Foreman, #3 Exhibit D1 Report and Declaration of S. Foreman, #4 Exhibit D2 Report and Declaration of S. Foreman)(Tam-Sugiyama, Joyce)
August 13, 2018 4 Additional Exhibits to #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C1 Additional Affidavit of D.Sargent, #2 Exhibit C2 Additional Affidavit of D. Sargent, #3 Exhibit C3 Additional Affidavit of D. Sargent)(Tam-Sugiyama, Joyce)
August 13, 2018 3 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/12/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 13, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00313 LEK-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 13, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by crane co. from First Circuit Court, case number 18-1-1103-07. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2074351), filed by crane co.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joyce W.Y. Tam-Sugiyama, #2 Exhibit A State Court Complaint and Summmons, #3 Exhibit B Affidavit of A. Pantaleoni, #4 Exhibit C Affidavit of D. Sargent [pp. 1-200])(Tam-Sugiyama, Joyce)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Provolt vs. Crane Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary E. Provolt
Represented By: Allison M. Fujita
Represented By: L. Richard DeRobertis
Represented By: Ilana Kananipiliokala Waxman
Represented By: Alyssa R Segawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Derek B Simon
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Joyce W. Y. Tam-Sugiyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?