Parente v. Cutter Honolulu, Inc., et al.

Plaintiff: Zachary Parente
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-5, Doe Corporations 1-5, John Does 1-5, Doe LLCs 1-5, Cutter Honolulu, Inc., Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5, Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5 and Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2018cv00320
Filed: August 16, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
Office: Hawaii Office
County: Honolulu
0 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
1 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2018 13 Mail Returned as Undeliverable ( re : 5 Minute Order). Mail sent to Zachary Parente at 15 Ipu Aumakua Lane, Lahaina, HI 96761- 1193 returned undeliverable. (emt, )
September 7, 2018 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cutter Honolulu, Inc. (Cox, Joachim)
September 5, 2018 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re ECF No. 5 Minute Order). Mail sent to Zachary Parente at 1020 Isenberg Street, Honolulu, HI 96826 returned undeliverable. The Minute Order was resent to Zachary Parent at 15 Ipu Aumakua Lane, Lahaina, HI 96761-1193 on September 7, 2018. (emt, ) Modified on 9/7/2018 (emt, ).
September 5, 2018 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re 5 Minute Order). Mail sent to Zachary Parente at 1020 Isenberg Street, Honolulu, HI 96826 returned undeliverable. (emt, )
September 4, 2018 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re 3 , #4 ). Mail sent to Zachary Parente at 1020 Isenberg Street, Honolulu, HI 96826 returned undeliverable. (Attachments: #1 ECF No. 3 - Notice of Case Assignment, #2 ECF No. 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Corporate Disclosure Memo) (emt, )
August 30, 2018 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (re ECF No. 3 , #4 ). Mail sent to Zachary Parente at 15 Ipu Amakua Lane, Lahaina, HI 96761 returned undeliverable. The Notice of Case Assignment and Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Corporate Disclosure Memo was resent to Mr. Parente at 1020 Isenberg Street, Honolulu, HI 96826 on August 31, 2018. (Attachments: #1 ECF No. 3 - Notice of Case Assignment, #2 ECF No. 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and Corporate Disclosure Memo) (emt, )
August 23, 2018 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Cutter Honolulu, Inc..(Cox, Joachim)
August 21, 2018 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, CV 18-1-0140-01 JPC. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Summons, #5 Letter to Circuit Court from Zachary E. A. Parente, #6 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (Cutter Honolulu, Inc.), #7 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Exhibit A; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
August 21, 2018 5 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2018 is CONTINUED to 10/31/2018 at 09:00AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 10/24/2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 16, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 3 Notice of Case Assignment, #4 Set Rule 16 Scheduling Conference has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Zachary Parente. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib, ) Zachary Parente: 1020 Isenberg Street. Honolulu, HI 96826.Zachary Parente: 15 Ipu Amakua Lane. Lahaina, HI 96761.
August 16, 2018 4 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/17/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 16, 2018 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00320-DKW-RLP on all further pleadings. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
August 16, 2018 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cutter Honolulu, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cutter Honolulu, Inc. for Cutter Honolulu, Inc... (Cox, Joachim)
August 16, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cutter Honolulu, Inc. dba Cutter Chrysler Jeep Dodge from First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 18-1-0140-1 JPC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2077048), filed by Cutter Honolulu, Inc. dba Cutter Chrysler Jeep Dodge. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joachim P. Cox, #2 Exhibit 1-Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2-Return of Service, #4 Exhibit 3-Parente Letter to Court, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cox, Joachim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parente v. Cutter Honolulu, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe LLCs 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cutter Honolulu, Inc.
Represented By: Kamala S. Haake
Represented By: Robert K. Fricke
Represented By: Joachim P. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Parente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?