Chambers v. Encore Capital Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mary Chambers
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC, Encore Capital Group, Inc. and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00333
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ALAN C KAY
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 14 EO: Because no answer or other response to the Complaint has been filed, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2018 is CONTINUED to 11/29/2018 at 9:15 a.m. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(agh)
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Chambers. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 9/17/2018 . (Brackett, Justin) Modified on 9/21/2018 (emt, ).
September 5, 2018 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Chambers. Encore Capital Group, Inc.. (Brackett, Justin)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Chambers. Midland Funding, LLC. (Brackett, Justin)
August 30, 2018 Filing 10 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
August 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/25/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(emt, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Midland Funding, LLC. (emt, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. (emt, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Encore Capital Group, Inc. (emt, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00333 ACK-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
August 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
August 30, 2018 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
August 30, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Brackett, Justin)
August 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Encore Capital Group, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2082623.), filed by Mary Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Declaration Verification, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brackett, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. Encore Capital Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Chambers
Represented By: Justin A. Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encore Capital Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?