Berkley Insurance Company v. American Capital Funding and Investment LLC et al

Plaintiff: Berkley Insurance Company
Defendant: First Hawaiian Bank and American Capital Funding and Investment LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00338
Filed: September 6, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
1 Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2018 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for (1) Declaratory Relief (2) Breach of Contract and (3) Pro Tanto Discharge of Surety; Exhibits "1"-"10" against All Defendants, filed by Berkley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Ogawa, Roy)
October 23, 2018 11 EO: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed 10/19/18 [ECF 7]. Pursuant to Local Rule 7.2(d), the Court finds this matter suitable for disposition without a hearing. The Motion having been timely filed and no parties having been served in action, the Court grants the Motion. Plaintiff is directed to file its Second Amended Complaint no later than 10/30/18. The hearing date of 11/26/18 on the Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is vacated. In light of the granting of the Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, the Court continues the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/5/18 until 11/27/18 @ 9:00 a.m. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference filed 10/20/18 [ECF no 8] is moot.granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot #8 Motion to Continue. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/27/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
October 22, 2018 10 EO: #8 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/18 @ 9:30 AM is CONTINUED to 11/26/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
October 22, 2018 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint :. Motion Hearing is set for 11/23/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. (tbf, )
October 20, 2018 8 Document is styled as a: MOTION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint Kurt K. Leong appearing for Plaintiff Berkley Insurance Company (Leong, Kurt) Docket text entry modified on 10/22/2018. NEF REGENERATED. (afc).
October 19, 2018 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff Berkley Insurance Company's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint against Berkley Insurance Company filed by Berkley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Ogawa, Roy) Docket text entry modified on 10/22/2018. Incorrect filing event selected. NEF REGENERATED. (afc)
September 10, 2018 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint For (1) Declaratory Relief; (2) Breach of Contract and (3) Pro Tanto Discharge of Surety against American Capital Funding and Investment LLC, First Hawaiian Bank, filed by Berkley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Leong, Kurt)
September 6, 2018 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Berkley Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Signet Star Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent W.R. Berkley Corporation for Berkley Insurance Company.. (Leong, Kurt)
September 6, 2018 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 6, 2018 3 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/5/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/6/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 6, 2018 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00338 JMS-KSC on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 6, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Plaintiff's Complaint for (1) Declaratory Relief; (2) Breach of Contract and (3) Pro Tanto Discharge of Surety against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2085642.), filed by Berkley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10)(Leong, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berkley Insurance Company v. American Capital Funding and Investment LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Hawaiian Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Capital Funding and Investment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berkley Insurance Company
Represented By: Kurt K. Leong
Represented By: Roy T. Ogawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?