United States of America v. Azure Fishery LLC

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Andy Ngog Hoang, Khang Quang Dang, Tuan Hoang, Azure Fishery LLC, Hahn Thi Nguyen and Linh Fishery LLC
Case Number: 1:2018cv00339
Filed: September 7, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
1 Judge: JILL A OTAKE
2 Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1319
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 31, 2018 21 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/2/2018 is CONTINUED to 12/27/2018 at 09:30AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 12/20/2018. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendants of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
October 25, 2018 20 Partial Consent Decree.Upon approval and entry of this Partial Consent Decree by the Court, this Decree shall constitute a final judgment of the Court as to the United States and Settling Defendants. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/24/2018. (cib, )
October 24, 2018 19 Featured Case ORDER.The Court, having considered the United States' Unopposed Motion to Enter Partial Consent Decree, and for good cause shown, hereby orders that the motion is GRANTED. The Court will sign and enter the Partial Consent Decree (ECF No.3-1) re #17 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/24/2018. (cib, )
October 23, 2018 18 Featured Case ORDER OF RECUSAL. U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE recused. Case reassigned to U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI for all further proceedings. Please reflect case number CV 18-00339-LEK-RLP on all further pleadings. Signed by U.S. DISTRICT JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 10/23/2018. (afc)
October 19, 2018 17 MOTION Unopposed Motion to Enter Partial Consent Decree re #3 Notice (Other) Jason T. Barbeau appearing for Plaintiff United States of America (Barbeau, Jason)
September 20, 2018 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Azure Fishery LLC served on 9/17/2018. (Bachman, Stefan) Modified on 9/21/2018 (emt, ).
September 18, 2018 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Andy Ngog Hoang served on 9/17/2018. (cib, )
September 18, 2018 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Tuan Hoang served on 9/16/2018 . (Bachman, Stefan) Modified on 9/19/2018 (emt, ).
September 12, 2018 13 Summons Issued as to Tuan Hoang. (emt, )
September 12, 2018 12 Summons Issued as to Azure Fishery LLC. (emt, )
September 12, 2018 11 Summons Issued as to Andy Ngog Hoang. (emt, )
September 11, 2018 10 Summons (Proposed) (Bachman, Stefan)
September 11, 2018 9 Summons (Proposed) (Bachman, Stefan)
September 11, 2018 8 Summons (Proposed) (Bachman, Stefan)
September 11, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Stefan J. Bachman on behalf of United States of America on behalf of United States of America. (Bachman, Stefan)
September 7, 2018 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 7, 2018 5 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/2/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 7, 2018 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00339 JAO-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 7, 2018 3 NOTICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint Notice of Lodging of Partial Consent Decree United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Partial Consent Decree)(Barbeau, Jason)
September 7, 2018 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T. Barbeau on behalf of United States of America on behalf of United States of America. (Barbeau, Jason)
September 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barbeau, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Azure Fishery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Ngog Hoang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khang Quang Dang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuan Hoang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Azure Fishery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hahn Thi Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linh Fishery LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jason T. Barbeau
Represented By: Stefan J. Bachman
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?