Progressive Casualty Insurance Co. v. Stevens et al

Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Insurance Co.
Defendant: Hawaiian Canoe Racing Association, Hawaiian Kamalii, Inc. and Mark David Stevens
Case Number: 1:2018cv00343
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: Hawaii District Court
0 Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
1 Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley)
November 9, 2018 15 Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Wakuzawa, Bruce)
November 9, 2018 14 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant Mark David Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Slaton, Randolph)
September 25, 2018 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hawaiian Canoe Racing Association, Hawaiian Kamalii, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wakuzawa, Bruce)
September 19, 2018 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Mark David Stevens re #11 Answer to Complaint (Slaton, Randolph)
September 18, 2018 11 Defendant Mark David Stevens' ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed on September 11, 2018 by Mark David Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Slaton, Randolph)
September 18, 2018 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed [Mark David Stevens] Acknowledgement filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Co.. (Shibuya, Ashley)
September 18, 2018 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed [Hawaiian Kamalii, Inc. dba Hawaiian Canoe Club, a Hawaii non-profit corporation and Hawaiian Canoe Racing Association, a Hawaii non-profit corporation] Acknowledgement filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Co.. (Shibuya, Ashley)
September 11, 2018 8 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Progressive Casualty Insurance Co.. (Shibuya, Ashley)
September 11, 2018 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 11, 2018 6 Featured Case Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 11/19/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 11, 2018 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
September 11, 2018 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00343 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 11, 2018 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Casualty Insurance Co.. (Shibuya, Ashley)
September 11, 2018 2 Summons (Proposed) (Shibuya, Ashley)
September 11, 2018 1 COMPLAINT For Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2087876.), filed by Progressive Casualty Insurance Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shibuya, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Casualty Insurance Co. v. Stevens et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Canoe Racing Association
Represented By: Bruce H. Wakuzawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaiian Kamalii, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce H. Wakuzawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark David Stevens
Represented By: Randolph R. Slaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Casualty Insurance Co.
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Represented By: Ashley R. Shibuya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?