RSMCFH, LLC v. FareHarbor Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: RSMCFH, LLC
Defendant: FareHarbor Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2018cv00348
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: RICHARD L PUGLISI
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting The Applications Of Michael A. Duffy and Laura A. Kelly To Appear Pro Hac Vice re #15 #16 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 11/9/2018. (cib, )
November 8, 2018 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FareHarbor Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Fujioka-Lilley, Terri)
November 8, 2018 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FareHarbor Holdings, Inc. re #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Laura Kelly Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2115227., #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael Duffy Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2115209. (Fujioka-Lilley, Terri)
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Laura Kelly Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2115227.Terri L. Fujioka-Lilley appearing for Defendant FareHarbor Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Form of Order)(Fujioka-Lilley, Terri)
November 8, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael Duffy Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2115209.Terri L. Fujioka-Lilley appearing for Defendant FareHarbor Holdings, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Counsel, #2 Form of Order)(Fujioka-Lilley, Terri)
November 8, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RSMCFH, LLC [Re: PLAINTIFF RSMCFH, LLCS OFFER OF SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT FAREHARBOR HOLDINGS, INC. (DATED NOVEMBER 7, 2018)] (Fujichaku, Rex)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 EO: Based on counsel's request and agreement, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 12/14/2018 is CONTINUED to 12/18/2018 at 09:15AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 12/11/2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
October 17, 2018 Filing 12 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2018 is CONTINUED to 12/14/2018 at 09:00AM in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 12/07/2018. Counsel for Plaintiff shall notify Defendant of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set by the Court. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting The Application Of Ana G. Guardado and Christopher L. Wanger To Appear Pro Hac Vice re #8 #9 . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI on 9/26/2018. (cib, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RSMCFH, LLC. FareHarbor Holdings, Inc. waiver sent on 9/17/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. (Fujichaku, Rex)
September 21, 2018 ADVISORY ENTRY. If the filing party has not already done so, the docket numbers #8 MOTION and Order for Pro Hac Vice (Christopher L. Wanger and #9 MOTION and Order for Pro Hac Vice (Ana G. Guardado)filed by RSMCFH, LLC shall be submitted by e-mail to Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi(puglisi_orders@hid.uscourts.gov)for consideration. The filing party may refer to LR100.8.1. Proposed Orders, LR100.8.2. E-mailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations, LR100.8.3. E-mail addresses for order and stipulation submission to Chambers. (cib, )
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Ana G. Guardado) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2092598.Margery S. Bronster appearing for Plaintiff RSMCFH, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bronster, Margery)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Christopher L. Wanger) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2092595.Margery S. Bronster appearing for Plaintiff RSMCFH, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Bronster, Margery)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, )
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/9/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to FareHarbor Holdings, Inc. (emt, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00348 LEK-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RSMCFH, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RSMCFH, LLC, Corporate Parent RSMCFH, LLC for RSMCFH, LLC.. (Bronster, Margery)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Bronster, Margery)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES FOR: (1) VIOLATION OF SECTION 10(B) OF THE SECURITIES EXCHANGE ACT OF 1934; (2) FRAUD; (3) BREACH OF STOCK SUBSCRIPTION AGREEMENT AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION; AND (4) VIOLATIONS OF HAW. REV. STAT. SECTIONS 485A-501 AND 485A-509 OF THE HAWAII UNIFORM SECURITIES ACT against FareHarbor Holdings, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2090244.), filed by RSMCFH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bronster, Margery)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RSMCFH, LLC v. FareHarbor Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FareHarbor Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Michael A. Duffy
Represented By: Terri L. Fujioka-Lilley
Represented By: Laura A. Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RSMCFH, LLC
Represented By: Margery S. Bronster
Represented By: Rex Y. Fujichaku
Represented By: Anthony F. Quan, Jr.
Represented By: Ana G. Guardado
Represented By: Christopher L. Wanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?