Broom v. Mydatt Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephen Broom
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-5, Doe Corporations 1-5, John Does 1-5, Doe LLCs 1-5, Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5, Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5, Mydatt Services, Inc., Block By Block, Jane Does 1-5 and SMS Holdings Company
Case Number: 1:2018cv00358
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KEVIN SC CHANG
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG on 10/22/2018. (afc)
October 22, 2018 Filing 10 EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference - Jury Trial is set for 10/22/19 @ 9:00 a.m. before Judge Seabright.Court to issue a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 10/22/2019 in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/10/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Settlement Conference is set for 7/11/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Kevin S.C. Chang before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/22/2019. Discovery due by 8/23/2019. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG)(tbf, )
October 15, 2018 Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Healy, Michael)
October 15, 2018 Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendants Mydatt Services, Inc., dba Block By Block, SMS Holdings Company, and Block By Block. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
October 2, 2018 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. (Healy, Michael)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed March 22, 2018 by Block By Block, Mydatt Services, Inc., SMS Holdings Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
September 21, 2018 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, CV 18-1-0454-03 KKH. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Computerized Index, #3 Civil Information Sheet, #4 Complaint; Summons, #5 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (CT Corporation for Mydatt Services, Inc.), #6 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (CT Corporation for Block by Block), #7 Return and Acknowledgment of Service (CT Corporation for SMS Holdings Company), #8 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal; Declaration of Frederick W. Rohlfing III; Exh A; Certificate of Service) (emt, )
September 21, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Block By Block, Mydatt Services, Inc., SMS Holdings Company identifying Corporate Parent SMS Holdings Company for Block By Block, Mydatt Services, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/22/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KEVIN S.C. CHANG - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00358 JMS-KSC on all further pleadings. (emt, )
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mydatt Services, Inc. dba Block by Block from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 18-1-0454-03 KKH. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2092042), filed by Mydatt Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Rohlfing, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Broom v. Mydatt Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe LLCs 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mydatt Services, Inc.
Represented By: Lissa H. Andrews
Represented By: Frederick W. Rohlfing, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Block By Block
Represented By: Lissa H. Andrews
Represented By: Frederick W. Rohlfing, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMS Holdings Company
Represented By: Lissa H. Andrews
Represented By: Frederick W. Rohlfing, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Broom
Represented By: Charles H. Brower
Represented By: Michael P. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?