Gallagher v. MaternityWise International, et al
Plaintiff: Danny Gallagher
Defendant: Maddison Weikle, Does 1-10, Jenna Chidester, Channa Jayde Walz, Elizabeth Geftakys, Elizbeth Anoatubby, MaternityWise International, Rachael Brown, Holly Leppard-Westhaver, Nicolette Raymond, Samantha Lajoie, Stephanie Gilbert, Esme Whritenour, Anne Croudace, Emilee Benner, Jane Doe Two, Cara Gwizd, Julie Bell, Eloise Victoria, Aerin Lund, Kate Pavlovsky, Bethany Kirillova, Jane Doe One, Jordan Ashley Hocker, Jane Doe Three, MaternityWise International LLC, Stephanie Byers, Emilee Saldaya, Rachael Aughenbaugh, Maddison Sisley Boulter, Jane Hopaki, Adrianna Brooks, Jennifer Chidester and Vivian Chau Best
Case Number: 1:2018cv00364
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 96 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maddison Sisley Boulter, Anne Croudace, MaternityWise International LLC [RE: DEFENDANTS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF DANNY GALLAGHER] (Yolken, Kevin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 95 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danny Gallagher RE Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Utzurrum, Jose)
June 28, 2019 Filing 94 Declaration re #93 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Fourth Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Exhibit 2c, #5 Exhibit 2d, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
June 28, 2019 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #87 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Danny Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
June 21, 2019 Filing 92 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Maddison Sisley Boulter, Anne Croudace, MaternityWise International LLC RE: INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Yolken, Kevin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 90 EO: COURT ORDER VACATING HEARING ON SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 89 ANSWER to #79 Amended Complaint, by Maddison Sisley Boulter, Anne Croudace, MaternityWise International LLC.(Yolken, Kevin)
June 12, 2019 Filing 88 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #87 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL : Motion Hearing is set for 7/19/2019 at 09:45 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )
June 12, 2019 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Kevin A Yolken appearing for Defendants Aerin Lund, Stephanie Byers, Emilee Saldaya, Kate Pavlovsky, Jane Hopaki, Bethany Kirillova (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Service)(Yolken, Kevin)
June 12, 2019 Filing 86 EO: In light of the 85 Entering Order setting the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 08/12/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 08/05/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 85 EO: Due to availability of Jose Utaurrum with joint agreement of opposing counsel, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 07/17/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 08/12/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Counsel Jose Utzurrum to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 10, 2019 Filing 84 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/13/2019 IS CONTINUED TO 07/17/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. If not already filed, Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 07/10/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 83 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Yolken, Kevin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 82 Scheduling Conference Statement (Plaintiff's). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
May 23, 2019 Filing 81 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (emt, )
May 22, 2019 Filing 80 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
May 22, 2019 Filing 79 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Danny Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Exhibit 2c, #5 Exhibit 2d, #6 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 EO: On May 9, 2019, Plaintiff filed his #76 Third Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting Plaintiff Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint or Alternatively Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to Give Notice of Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint ("Motion"). Given the liberal standard set forth in Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2), and given the lack of any opposition, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Plaintiff shall file his proposed Fourth Amended Complaint for Damages, attached as Exhibit "1" to the Motion, by 05/24/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 05/22/2019. (mansfield2)
May 9, 2019 Filing 77 EO: On May 9, 2019, Plaintiff filed his #76 Third Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting Plaintiff Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint or Alternatively Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to Give Notice of Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. The Court finds this matter suitable for disposition without a hearing pursuant to Rule 7.2(d) of the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii. Any oppositions are due by 05/16/2019. Plaintiff may file a reply by 05/20/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD) (mansfield2)
May 9, 2019 Filing 76 EX PARTE Application FOR ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO GIVE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT Jose Utzurrum appearing for Plaintiff Danny Gallagher (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Ex 1 to the 4th Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2a to the 4th Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2b to the 4th Amended Complainy, #5 Exhibit 2c to the 4th Amended Complain, #6 Exhibit 2d to the 4th Amended Complaint, #7 Declaration of Joe Utzurrum, #8 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 EO: On May 7, 2019, Plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting Plaintiff Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint or Alternatively Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to Give Notice of Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint ("First Motion"). ECF No. 70. On May 8, 2019, the Court denied the First Motion for failure to comply with Local Rule 10.3, which requires a party moving to file an amended complaint to "reproduce the entire pleading as amended[.]" See ECF No. 72. On May 9, 2019, Plaintiff filed a Renewed Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting Plaintiff Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint or Alternatively Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to Give Notice of Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint ("Second Motion"). ECF No. 73. That same day, Plaintiff also filed as a separate entry on the docket his Fourth Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial. ECF No. 74.To clarify, Local Rule 10.3 requires a party moving to file an amended complaint to reproduce the entire proposed pleading as an exhibit to the moving party's motion. The Court thus DENIES the #73 Second Motion and STRIKES the #74 Fourth Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial. Such denial is WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiff filing a renewed motion that complies with the Local Rules and this Order. Any proposed pleading Plaintiff submits in connection with a renewed motion shall be in redline format so as to clearly indicate the proposed revisions to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 05/09/2019. (mansfield2)
May 8, 2019 Filing 74 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOURTH AMENDED against All Defendants, filed by Danny Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2a, #3 Exhibit 2b, #4 Exhibit 2c, #5 Exhibit 2d, #6 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
May 8, 2019 Filing 73 EX PARTE Application FOR ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT OR ALTERNATIVELY EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO GIVE NOTICE OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT Jose Utzurrum appearing for Plaintiff Danny Gallagher (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joe Utzurrum in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 EO: On May 7, 2019, Plaintiff filed an Ex Parte Application for Order Permitting Plaintiff Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint or Alternatively Ex Parte Application for Order Shortening Time to Give Notice of Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint ("Motion"). ECF No. 70. The Motion seeks leave to file a fourth amended complaint. The Motion, however, does not comply with Local Rule 10.3, which requires a party moving to file an amended complaint to "reproduce the entire pleading as amended[.]" The Court thus DENIES the Motion WITHOUT PREJUDICE to a renewed motion for leave to amend that complies with the Local Rules. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 05/08/2019. (mansfield2)
May 7, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Lodging Of Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint by Danny Gallagher re #70 EX PARTE Application Danny Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2a to Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2b to Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2c to Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2d to Proposed Fourth Amended Complaint, #7 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose) Modified on 5/8/2019 to add docket text (cib).
May 7, 2019 Filing 70 EX PARTE Application Jose Utzurrum appearing for Plaintiff Danny Gallagher (Attachments: #1 Declaration Joe Utzurrum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
April 17, 2019 Filing 69 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cib)
April 16, 2019 Filing 68 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
April 16, 2019 Filing 67 NOTICE Of Lodging Of Third Amended Complaint With Tracked Changes filed by Danny Gallagher re #66 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lodged Third Amended Complaint with Tracked Changes, #2 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
April 16, 2019 Filing 66 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Danny Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2a, #3 Exhibit Ex 2b, #4 Exhibit Ex 2c, #5 Exhibit Ex 2d, #6 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
March 18, 2019 Filing 65 EO: In light of the #64 Order allowing Plaintiff to file his third amended complaint by no later than April 29, 2019, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 04/11/2019 IS CONTINUED TO the next available date of 06/13/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 06/06/2019. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part: 1) Defendants' Motion To Dimiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint For Damages and Demand For Jury Trial; 2) Defendant Lund's Joinder; and 3) Defendant Saldaya's Joinder re #49 #52 #55 . To the extent that Plaintiff's claims have been dismissed without prejudice, this Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file a third amended complaint consistent with the terms of this Order. Plaintiff must file his third amended complaint by no later than April 29, 2019. This Court CAUTIONS Plaintiff that, if he fails to file his third amended complaint by April 29, 2019, the claims which this Order dismissed without prejudice may be dismissed with prejudice. Further, if Plaintiff's third amended complaint fails to cure the defects identified in this Order, this Court may dismiss those claims with prejudice. If Plaintiff's third amended complaint attempts to add new parties, claims, or theories of liability, this Court may dismiss those claims, but without prejudice. Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 2/27/2019. (cib)
February 15, 2019 Filing 63 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Aerin Lund served on 12/16/2018 filed by Danny Gallagher. (Utzurrum, Jose) Modified on 2/19/2019 to add service date to docket text (cib, ).
January 25, 2019 Filing 62 EP: Motion Hearing held on 1/25/2019 re #55 MOTION for Joinder filed by Emilee Saldaya, #52 MOTION for Joinder re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Aerin Lund, #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Bethany Kirillova, Stephanie Gilbert, Anne Croudace, MaternityWise International LLC, Maddison Weikle, Elizbeth Anoatubby, Kate Pavlovsky, Stephanie Byers. (Court Reporter Debi Read.) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 61 Errata To Defendants Reply In Support Of Motion To Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Reply In Support Of Motion To Dismiss, #2 Certificate of Service)(Yolken, Kevin)
January 11, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY to Response to Motion re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Elizbeth Anoatubby, Stephanie Byers, Anne Croudace, Bethany Kirillova, Aerin Lund, MaternityWise International LLC, Kate Pavlovsky, Emilee Saldaya, Maddison Weikle. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Kevin A. Yolken, #2 Certificate of Service)(Yolken, Kevin)
January 4, 2019 Filing 59 Declaration re #57 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Joe Utzurrum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose) ).
January 4, 2019 Filing 58 Declaration re #57 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Declaration of Joe Utzurrum. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose)
January 4, 2019 Filing 57 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #55 MOTION for Joinder , #52 MOTION for Joinder re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial , #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial filed by Danny Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert re L.R. 7.5)(Utzurrum, Jose)
December 28, 2018 Filing 56 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #55 MOTION for Joinder : Motion Hearing is set for 1/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )
December 28, 2018 Filing 55 MOTION for Joinder to #49 Specially Appearing Defendants' MOTION TO DISMISS Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damanges and Demand for Jury Trial; Certificate of Service Kevin A Yolken appearing for Defendant Emilee Saldaya (Yolken, Kevin) Docket text entry modified on 12/31/2018 to further describe document and to add document number link to correlate to the underlying Motion, ECF no. #49 . (afc).
December 21, 2018 Filing 54 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danny Gallagher. Emilee Saldaya served on 12/10/2018. (Utzurrum, Jose) Docket text modified on 12/26/2018 (emt, ).
December 20, 2018 Filing 53 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #52 MOTION for Joinder re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial : Motion Hearing is set for 1/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 52 MOTION for Joinder re #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial Eric A. Seitz appearing for Defendant Aerin Lund (Seitz, Eric)
December 17, 2018 Filing 51 EO: In light of the #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 02/01/2018 IS CONTINUED TO 04/11/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference are due by 04/04/2019. Counsel Jose Utzurrum to notify the parties. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
December 17, 2018 Filing 50 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial : Motion Hearing is set for 1/25/2019 at 10:30 AM in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (wnn, )
December 14, 2018 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial Eric A. Seitz appearing for Defendants MaternityWise International LLC, Stephanie Gilbert, Kate Pavlovsky, Stephanie Byers, Elizbeth Anoatubby, Anne Croudace, Maddison Weikle, Bethany Kirillova (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric A. Seitz, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service)(Seitz, Eric)
December 13, 2018 Filing 48 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Elizabeth Geftakys ONLY. filed byDanny Gallagher. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Utzurrum, Jose) Modified docket text on 12/14/2018 (cib, ).
December 11, 2018 Filing 47 SUMMONS Returned Executed on Elizbeth Anoatubby served 12/11/2018 filed by Danny Gallagher. (Utzurrum, Jose)
December 11, 2018 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danny Gallagher. Kate Pavlovsky. (Utzurrum, Jose)
December 11, 2018 Filing 45 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bethany Kirillova served on 11/3/2018 filed by Danny Gallagher. . (Utzurrum, Jose)
December 11, 2018 Filing 44 SUMMONS Returned Executed on Stephanie Gilbert served on 10/25/2018 filed by Danny Gallagher. . (Utzurrum, Jose)
December 11, 2018 Filing 43 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Anne Croudace served on 11/6/2018 filed by Danny Gallagher. (Utzurrum, Jose)
December 11, 2018 Filing 42 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to MaternityWise International LLC served on 11/6/2018 filed by Danny Gallagher. . (Utzurrum, Jose)
November 30, 2018 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Danny Gallagher re: Service of Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Jordan Ashley Hocker (Dkt. No. #40 ) (Utzurrum, Jose)
November 30, 2018 Filing 40 NOTICE of Dismissal of defendant Jordan Ashley Hocker Danny Gallagher. (Utzurrum, Jose)
November 27, 2018 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #39 Order has been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record on Kate Pavlovsky. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (cib, )
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 AGREED ORDER For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint re #37 . Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 11/16/2018. (cib, )COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 16, 2018 Filing 37 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint re #33 filed by Defendant Stephanie Byers. (cib, )
October 5, 2018 Filing 36 NOTICE by Danny Gallagher of Intent to Serve Defendants by the Process set Forth in the Hague Convention Danny Gallagher. (Utzurrum, Jose)
October 5, 2018 Filing 35 Summons Issued as to MaternityWise International LLC. (cib, )
October 4, 2018 Filing 34 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
October 4, 2018 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND AMENDED) against Elizbeth Anoatubby, Julie Bell, Rachael Brown, Jenna Chidester, Anne Croudace, Does 1-10, Elizabeth Geftakys, Stephanie Gilbert, Cara Gwizd, Jordan Ashley Hocker, Jane Doe One, Jane Doe Three, Jane Doe Two, Bethany Kirillova, Samantha Lajoie, Holly Leppard-Westhaver, Aerin Lund, Kate Pavlovsky, Nicolette Raymond, Emilee Saldaya, Eloise Victoria, Channa Jayde Walz, Maddison Weikle, Esme Whritenour, MaternityWise International LLC, filed by Danny Gallagher.(Utzurrum, Jose)
October 1, 2018 Filing 32 EO: Counsel Jose Utzurrum informs the Court of the international serving of the complaint on numerous defendants, therefore request additional time to be able to do so. Request is granted. The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/26/2018 IS CONTINUED TO 02/01/2019 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Rule 16 scheduling statements are due by 01/25/2019. Mr. Jose Utzurrum to file the Notice of Commencement of Service in a Foreign Country through Hague Convention. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
September 27, 2018 Filing 31 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cib, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 30 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 26, 2018 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (cib, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 28 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 26, 2018 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Danny Gallagher.(Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 26 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 25 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 24 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 23 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 22 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 21 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 20 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 19 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 18 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 17 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 16 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 15 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 14 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 13 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 12 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 9 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 ADVISORY ENTRY. No further action necessary. The entry docket number #1 Complaint filed by Danny Gallagher was filed incorrectly in this case. Please refer to LR100.5.1., which states "The name of the CM/ECF user under whose login and and password the document is being electronically filed must be preceded by "/s/" and typed in the space where the signature otherwise would appear (e.g. /s/ John or Jane Lawyer) " (cib, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet. (Attachments: #1 AO 398- Notice of Lawsuit, #2 AO 399- Waiver of Summons)(cib, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Elizbeth Anoatubby, Julie Bell, Emilee Benner, Rachael Brown, Jenna Chidester, Anne Croudace, Elizabeth Geftakys, Stephanie Gilbert, Cara Gwizd, Jordan Ashley Hocker, Bethany Kirillova, Samantha Lajoie, Holly Leppard-Westhaver, Aerin Lund, MaternityWise International, Kate Pavlovsky, Nicolette Raymond, Eloise Victoria, Channa Jayde Walz, Maddison Weikle, Esme Whritenour. (Attachments: #1 Issued Summons Anne Croudace)(cib, )
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:30AM on 11/26/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/25/2018. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Memo re: Corporate Disclosure)(cib, ) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO re: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENTS MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.
September 25, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 18-00364-LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (cib, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Danny Gallagher. (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Utzurrum, Jose)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2094029.), filed by Danny Gallagher.(Utzurrum, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallagher v. MaternityWise International, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maddison Weikle
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenna Chidester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Channa Jayde Walz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Geftakys
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizbeth Anoatubby
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaternityWise International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Leppard-Westhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolette Raymond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Lajoie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Gilbert
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esme Whritenour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Croudace
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilee Benner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Two
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara Gwizd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eloise Victoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aerin Lund
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Pavlovsky
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethany Kirillova
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe One
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Ashley Hocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Three
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MaternityWise International LLC
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Byers
Represented By: Eric A. Seitz
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emilee Saldaya
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachael Aughenbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maddison Sisley Boulter
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Hopaki
Represented By: Kevin A Yolken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrianna Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Chidester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian Chau Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Gallagher
Represented By: Jose Utzurrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?